AMCO Insurance Company et al v. Gree USA, Inc et al

Plaintiff: AMCO Insurance Company, Debra Stepanek and Donald Stepanek
Defendant: MJC America, Ltd., Gree USA, Inc., Gree USA, Inc and MJC America, Ltd
Case Number: 1:2019cv00021
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 Filing 10 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by MJC America, Ltd (Lindebak, Aaron)
April 1, 2019 Set Deadline: Defendant MJC America, Ltd LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 4/13/2019. (jjh)
April 1, 2019 Set Deadline: Defendant Gree USA, Inc LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 4/21/2019. (jjh)
March 29, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by AMCO Insurance Company. MJC America, Ltd served on 3/14/2019, answer due 4/4/2019. (Driscoll, Kevin) Modified dates on 4/1/2019 (jjh).
March 29, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by AMCO Insurance Company. Gree USA, Inc served on 3/22/2019, answer due 4/12/2019. (Driscoll, Kevin) Modified dates on 4/1/2019 (jjh).
March 29, 2019 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Marisa L. Saber on behalf of Plaintiff AMCO Insurance Company. Upon a review of the Motion and the Certificate of Good Standing, the court finds the Motion should be granted. Signed by Clerk on 03/29/2019. (conflicts checked, none found. IPM verified) (jjh)
March 28, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Marisa L. Saber ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2906151) by Plaintiff AMCO Insurance Company (Driscoll, Kevin)
March 25, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by AMCO Insurance Company identifying Other Affiliate Allied Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company for AMCO Insurance Company. (Driscoll, Kevin)
March 21, 2019 Set Deadlines: Plaintiff LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 4/4/2019. Defendant LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 4/19/2019. (jjh)
March 20, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER With Jury Demand to Complaint by Gree USA, Inc, MJC America, Ltd.(Lindebak, Aaron)
February 21, 2019 Set Deadline: Scheduling Report due by 5/29/2019 (jjh)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Gree USA, Inc., MJC America, Ltd.. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Case Packet) (jjh)
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 3/21/2019. (jjh)
February 19, 2019 Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts. (conflicts checked, none found) (jjh)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Jury Demand against Gree USA, Inc., MJC America, Ltd. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2875209.), filed by AMCO Insurance Company, Donald Stepanek, Debra Stepanek. SchedReport Deadline 5/29/2019 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Driscoll, Kevin) Modified on 2/22/2019 (jjh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AMCO Insurance Company et al v. Gree USA, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMCO Insurance Company
Represented By: Kevin J Driscoll
Represented By: Marisa L Saber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Stepanek
Represented By: Kevin J Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Stepanek
Represented By: Kevin J Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MJC America, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gree USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gree USA, Inc
Represented By: Aaron Wehde Lindebak
Represented By: Clark Ian Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MJC America, Ltd
Represented By: Aaron Wehde Lindebak
Represented By: Clark Ian Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?