Wilcox et al v. Gray Television Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Diana Wilcox and Jeff Wilcox
Defendant: Gray Television Group, Inc. and Gray Television Group, Inc
Case Number: 1:2019cv00031
Filed: March 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated pursuant to #11 Stipulation of Dismissal (MAR Chambers). (skm)
May 8, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Diana Wilcox (Wagner, John)
April 16, 2019 Filing 10 (DOCKETED IN ERROR) MOTION to Dismiss by Plaintiff Diana Wilcox. Responses due by 4/30/2019. (Wagner, John) Modified on 4/17/2019 (jjh).
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #5 State Court Petition. Defendant Gray Television Group, Inc., may have to and including 4/24/2019, to file a response to the petition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 3/27/2019 (eWagner). (skm)
March 25, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or other Responsive Pleading (Unopposed) by Defendant Gray Television Group, Inc (Giudicessi, Michael)
March 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE to Attorney Not Admitted to Practice: John C Wagner. (eWagner) (jjh) Modified on 3/27/2019 (jjh).
March 19, 2019 Set Deadline: Defendant LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 4/8/2019. (jjh)
March 19, 2019 Filing 6 DOCKET Annotation: Attached please find new civil removal case packet. (jjh)
March 19, 2019 Filing 5 STATE Court Petition with Jury Demand by Diana Wilcox, Jeff Wilcox (jjh)
March 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 4/18/2019. (jjh)
March 19, 2019 Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts. (conflicts checked, none found) (jjh)
March 18, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Filing by Gray Television Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A) (Giudicessi, Michael)
March 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Gray Television Group, Inc. Certificate Pursuant to Local Rule 81 (Giudicessi, Michael)
March 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Linn County, case number CVCV092123. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2897551), filed by Gray Television Group, Inc.. Scheduling Report due by 5/17/2019 (Attachments: #1 Ex. A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Giudicessi, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilcox et al v. Gray Television Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Wilcox
Represented By: John C Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Wilcox
Represented By: John C Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gray Television Group, Inc.
Represented By: Michael A Giudicessi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gray Television Group, Inc
Represented By: Michael A Giudicessi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?