Mukeshimana v. General Mills Operations, LLC
Plaintiff: Sperasia Mukeshimana
Defendant: General Mills Operations, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00033
Filed: March 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Linda R Reade
Referring Judge: Mark A Roberts
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TRIAL Management Order: Witness and exhibit lists exchanged by parties (but not filed) at least 21 days before FPTC. Exhibits marked. Jury Instructions 3 days before FPTC. Motions in limine 21 days before FPTC. Jury Trial set for 8/17/2020 9:00 AM in Ctrm 1 (2nd Floor) Cedar Rapids before Judge Linda R Reade. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/16/2020 4:00 PM in Ctrm 1 (2nd Floor) Cedar Rapids before Judge Linda R Reade. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/13/2020. Signed by Judge Linda R Reade on 6/27/19. (ksy)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING Order and Discovery Plan: Initial Disclosures due date of 6/25/2019 but not filed with the court. Add Parties Deadline due by 8/19/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 8/19/2019. Plaintiffs Expert Witness due by 9/18/2019. Defendants Expert Witnesses due by 11/18/2019. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Experts due by 12/18/2019. Discovery due by 2/18/2020. Motions due by 3/18/2020. Trial Ready Deadline 8/18/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 6/27/2019. (src)
June 26, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts: Scheduling Conference held on 6/26/2019. (Official Court Record: FTR Gold) (jjh)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Setting Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16(b) and 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 6/26/2019 at 9:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 6/14/2019. (mmc)
April 4, 2019 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on the #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Spiwe Jefferson on behalf of General Mills Operations, LLC. Upon review of the Motion and Certificate of Good Standing, the court finds the Motion should be granted. Check Status deadline set for CM/ECF registration by 4/18/2019. Signed by Clerk on 4/4/2019 (NEF eJefferson). (skm)
March 29, 2019 Filing 7 (AMENDED) PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by General Mills Operations, LLC (Stefani, Richard) Modified text on 3/29/2019 (jjh).
March 29, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by General Mills Operations, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Mills Inc for General Mills Operations, LLC. (Stefani, Richard)
March 29, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Spiwe Jefferson ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2907118) by Defendant General Mills Operations, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Stefani, Richard) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/4/2019: #2 Current Certificate of Good Standing) (skm).
March 21, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER With Jury Demand to Complaint by General Mills Operations, LLC.(Stefani, Richard)
March 21, 2019 Set Deadline: Defendant LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 4/11/2019. (ksy)
March 21, 2019 Filing 3 DOCKET Annotation: New Removal Case Packet attached (ksy)
March 21, 2019 Filing 2 STATE Court Petition With Jury Demand by Sperasia Mukeshimana (ksy)
March 21, 2019 Judge Linda R Reade and Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. (Conflicts reviewed, none found) (ksy)
March 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Iowa District Court for Linn County, case number LACV091890. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2899641), filed by General Mills Operations, LLC. Scheduling Report due by 5/20/2019 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement LR81 Statement, #3 Exhibit State Court Petition, #4 Exhibit Jury Demand, #5 Exhibit Original Notice, #6 Exhibit Notice of Firm and Address Change, #7 Exhibit Affidavit of Service, #8 Exhibit Appearance for Defendant) (Stefani, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mukeshimana v. General Mills Operations, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sperasia Mukeshimana
Represented By: Dustin M Mueller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Mills Operations, LLC
Represented By: Richard A Stefani
Represented By: Spiwe L Jefferson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?