Crowley v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: JAMES J. CROWLEY and James J Crowley
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2019cv00035
Filed: March 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly KE Mahoney
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1383
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2019 Filing 12 SOCIAL Security Briefing Schedule Order. Pursuant to 42 USC Sec. 405(g) and Local Rule 16(d)(1), this case will be submitted to the Court as follows: Plaintiff proposed stipulation of facts to Defendant (not filed with Court) not later than 30 days from this date. Defendant response to Plaintiff not later than 60 days. Statement of Facts due for filing by 8/24/2019. Plaintiff's Brief due by 9/8/2019. Defendant's Brief due by 10/8/2019. Plaintiff's Reply Brief due by 10/18/2019. Signed by Clerk on 6/10/2019. (pac)
June 10, 2019 DOCKET Annotation re #10 Social Security Transcript Vol 1, and #11 Social Security Transcript Vol 2. Tabbed and bound hard copies of two volumes of transcripts received, and housed in SC Clerk's office.
June 7, 2019 Filing 11 SOCIAL Security Transcript Filed (Part 2 of 2) (Attachments: #1 Transcript Part 15 of 22, #2 Transcript Part 16 of 22, #3 Transcript Part 17 of 22, #4 Transcript Part 2 of 22Transcript Part 18 of 22, #5 Transcript Part 19 of 22, #6 Transcript Part 20 of 22, #7 Transcript Part 21 of 22, #8 Transcript Part 22 of 22) (Schunk, Jacob)
June 7, 2019 Filing 10 SOCIAL Security Transcript Filed (Part 1 of 2) (Attachments: #1 Transcript Part 2 of 22, #2 Transcript Part 3 of 22, #3 Transcript Part 4 of 22, #4 Transcript Part 5 of 22, #5 Transcript Part 6 of 22, #6 Transcript Part 7 of 22, #7 Transcript Part 8 of 22, #8 Transcript Part 9 of 22, #9 Transcript Part 10 of 22, #10 Transcript Part 11 of 22, #11 Transcript Part 12 of 22, #12 Transcript Part 13 of 22) (Schunk, Jacob)
June 7, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint (Transcript e-filed separately) by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Schunk, Jacob)
June 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Elvi D Jenkins on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security. (Jenkins, Elvi)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Upon consent of the parties Commissioner of Social Security and James J Crowley, this case is assigned to Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney for final disposition. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 4/19/19. (ksy)
April 19, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by James J Crowley re #1 Complaint Certified Returned Receipts for Process Service of Complaint (Johnson, J) Modified text on 4/22/2019 (pac).
April 19, 2019 Filing 5 (FILED IN ERROR) NOTICE by James J Crowley Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge (Johnson, J) Modified text on 4/22/2019 (pac).
April 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob A Schunk on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security. (Schunk, Jacob)
March 25, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 Social Security Case Packet) (pac)
March 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 4/24/2019. (pac)
March 25, 2019 Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney added (no conflicts identified). (pac)
March 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2902228.), filed by James J Crowley. Scheduling Report due by 6/20/2019 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Johnson, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crowley v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES J. CROWLEY
Represented By: J. RICHARD JOHNSON
Represented By: J Richard Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James J Crowley
Represented By: J Richard Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Elvi D Jenkins
Represented By: Jacob A Schunk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?