Shupe v. Transamerica Life Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Joyce Shupe
Defendant: Transamerica Life Insurance Company
Amicus Curiae: Gail Thompson
Case Number: 1:2019cv00045
Filed: April 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly Mahoney
Referring Judge: Kelly KE Mahoney
2 Judge: Linda R Reade
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Filing 27 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Stay Due to a duplicative class action lawsuit in California filed by Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Smelley, Hutson)
June 20, 2019 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Stay Due to a duplicative class action lawsuit in California filed by Gail Thompson. (Bohlman, Brandon)
June 13, 2019 Filing 25 BRIEF in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Stay Due to a duplicative class action lawsuit in California filed by Joyce Shupe. (Fearon, Stephen)
June 11, 2019 Filing 24 AMICUS BRIEF in Support of #7 Motion to Stay by Gail Thompson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amicus Brief, #2 Exhibit B to Brief, #3 Exhibit C to Brief) (Bohlman, Brandon) Modified on 6/11/2019 (des)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Leave to File an amicus brief. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 6/10/2019. (mmc)
June 7, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief Unopposed by Gail Thompson (Attachments: #1 Amicus Brief, #2 Exhibit A to Brief, #3 Exhibit B to Brief, #4 Exhibit C to Brief) (Bohlman, Brandon) Modified on 6/7/2019 to correct name of motion (skm).
June 7, 2019 Filing 21 MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 6/6/2019. The court stays defendants deadline to respond to #8 motion for expedited discovery, #9 motion for preliminary injunction, and #10 motion to certify class, pending resolution of #7 motion to stay. No order to follow. (Official Court Record: FTR Gold) (des)
June 5, 2019 Filing 20 *TEXT ORDER ONLY* granting #18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Stephen J Fearon (Pro Hac Vice Fee $100 receipt number 0862-2952607) and #19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Paul V Sweeny (Pro Hac Vice Fee $100 receipt number 0862-2952708): Upon review of the motions and certificates of good standing, the court finds that these motions should be granted. It is so ordered that Attorneys Stephen J Fearon and Paul V Sweeny are authorized to appear on behalf of Plaintiff Joyce Shupe. Signed by Clerk on 6/5/2019. (pac)
June 4, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Paul V. Sweeny ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2952708) by Plaintiff Joyce Shupe (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Green, Jenna)
June 4, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Stephen J. Fearon ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2952607) by Plaintiff Joyce Shupe (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Green, Jenna)
June 3, 2019 Filing 17 ** TEXT ORDER ONLY ** Setting Hearing; Telephone Conference set for 6/6/2019 at 2:15 PM (Central) (Telephonic Hearing - see dial-in participation instructions contained in this order) before Chief United States Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney. The hearing will take place using the Court's conference bridge. The parties shall access the hearing by: (1) calling 877-336-1831, (2) enter access code 3495185 #, (3) press # to enter as a participant, (4) enter security code 1831 #. The call will become active upon the "host" (the Court) entering the conference bridge. Signed by Chief United States Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 06/03/2019. (Gollhofer, Jami)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Referring Motions: #7 MOTION to Stay Due to a duplicative class action lawsuit in California filed by Transamerica Life Insurance Company and #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Joyce Shupe referred to Chief Magistrate Judge Kelley K.E. Mahoney. Signed by Judge Linda R Reade on 06/03/2019. (jjh)
June 3, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Linda R Reade and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney. (pursuant to RLP) (kms)
June 3, 2019 Filing 15 *TEXT ORDER ONLY * granting #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Thomas FA Hetherington (Pro Hac Vice Fee $100 receipt number 0862-2950893); #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Hutson B Smelley (Pro Hac Vice Fee $100 receipt number 0862-2950897), #13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Erin E Bennett (Pro Hac Vice Fee $100 receipt number 0862-2950914); and #14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jarrett E Ganer (Pro Hac Vice Fee $100 receipt number 0862-2950920): Upon review of the motions and certificates of good standing, the court finds that these motions should be granted. It is so ordered that Attorneys Thomas FA Hetherington, Hutson B Smelley, Erin E Bennett, and Jarrett E Ganer are authorized to appear on behalf of Defendant Transamerica Life Insurance Company.. Signed by Clerk on 6/3/2019. (pac)
May 31, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jarrett E. Ganer ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2950920) by Defendant Transamerica Life Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Good Standng) (Stone, Wilford)
May 31, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Erin E. Bennett ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2950914) by Defendant Transamerica Life Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificatee of Good Standng) (Stone, Wilford)
May 31, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Hutson B. Smelley ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2950897) by Defendant Transamerica Life Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Stone, Wilford)
May 31, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Thomas F.A. Hetherington ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2950893) by Defendant Transamerica Life Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Stone, Wilford) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/31/2019 for correct atty name) (skm).
May 31, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Certify Class by Plaintiff Joyce Shupe Responses due by 6/14/2019 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration) (Green, Jenna)
May 31, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Joyce Shupe (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration) (Green, Jenna)
May 31, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Expedited Discovery by Plaintiff Joyce Shupe (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration) (Green, Jenna) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/31/2019: #3 Memorandum in Support of Motion) (skm).
May 30, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Stay Due to a duplicative class action lawsuit in California by Defendant Transamerica Life Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Brief) (Stone, Wilford)
May 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan Kooker on behalf of Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Kooker, Nathan)
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Wilford H Stone on behalf of Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Stone, Wilford)
May 6, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Joyce Shupe. Transamerica Life Insurance Company waiver sent on 4/25/2019, answer due 6/24/2019. (Fearon, Stephen) Modified date waiver sent and date answer due on 5/7/2019 (pac).
April 19, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Transamerica Life Insurance Company. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 Civil Case Packet) (pac)
April 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 5/19/2019. (pac)
April 19, 2019 Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney added (no conflicts identified). (pac)
April 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT With Jury Demand Joyce Shupe against Transamerica Life Insurance Company (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0862-2921982), filed by Joyce Shupe. Scheduling Report Deadline 7/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Green, Jenna) Modified text on 4/19/2019 (pac).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shupe v. Transamerica Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Shupe
Represented By: Jenna Lee Green
Represented By: Thomas William Kyle
Represented By: Paul V Sweeny
Represented By: Stephen J Fearon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transamerica Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas F.A. Hetherington
Represented By: Hutson B Smelley
Represented By: Wilford H Stone
Represented By: Erin E Bennett
Represented By: Nathan Kooker
Represented By: Jarrett E Ganer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Gail Thompson
Represented By: Brandon McCaull Bohlman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?