Evans v. Wright Medical Technology, Inc
Plaintiff: Nelson Evans, Jr
Defendant: Wright Medical Technology, Inc. and Wright Medical Technology, Inc
Case Number: 1:2019cv00055
Filed: May 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly Mahoney
Referring Judge: Kelly KE Mahoney
2 Judge: Leonard T Strand
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 7 RESISTANCE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc.'s Partial Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike filed by Nelson Evans, Jr. (Benton, Danae)
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Wright Medical Technology, Inc (Lederer, Gregory)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc.'s Partial Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike by Defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc. Responses due by 6/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc.'s Partial Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike) (Lederer, Gregory) Modified text on 6/14/2019 (pac).
May 31, 2019 Filing 4 *TEXT ORDER ONLY* granting #3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Danae N Benton (Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2949396). Upon review of the motion and certificate of good standing, the court finds that the motion should be granted. It is so ordered that Attorney Danae N Benton is authorized to appear on behalf of Plaintiff Nelson Evans, Jr (ECF Registration Form due by 6/14/2019). Signed by Clerk on 5/31/2019. (pac)
May 30, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Danae N. Benton ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2949396) by Plaintiff Nelson Evans, Jr (Attachments: #1 Good Standing) (Baresel, William)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Wright Medical Technology, Inc. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 Civil Case Packet) (pac)
May 6, 2019 Chief Judge Leonard T Strand and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney added (no conflicts identified). (pac)
May 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT With Jury Demand against Wright Medical Technology, Inc (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0862-2933854), filed by Nicholas Evans. Scheduling Report due by 8/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Baresel, William) Modified text on 5/6/2019 (pac).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. Wright Medical Technology, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nelson Evans, Jr
Represented By: William P Baresel
Represented By: Danae N Benton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wright Medical Technology, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wright Medical Technology, Inc
Represented By: Gregory M Lederer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?