Gearhart v. Mediacom Communications Corporation, LLC

Plaintiff: Jayson Gearhart
Defendant: Mediacom Communications Corporation, LLC and Deborah Hornbuckle
Case Number: 1:2019cv00056
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Linda R Reade
Referring Judge: Mark A Roberts
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 23 JOINDER in Motion re #21 MOTION to Dismiss, #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Deborah Hornbuckle, Mediacom Communications Corporation, LLC. (Nass, Mitchell)
June 25, 2019 Filing 22 SUPPLEMENT/ADDENDUM #21 MOTION to Dismiss by Mediacom Communications Corporation, LLC (Nass, Mitchell)
June 24, 2019 Filing 21 AMENDED PRE-ANSWER MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's #12 Amended Complaint by Defendant Mediacom Communications Corporation, LLC. Responses due by 7/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 FILED IN ERROR Brief) (jjh) Modified text on 6/25/2019 (des)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Leave to File Amended Pre-Answer Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint and Brief by Defendant Mediacom Communications Corporation, LLC. The Clerks Office is directed to detach and file the Defendants Amended Pre-Answer Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Amended Complaint attached at Doc. 19-1 and Defendants Reply in Further Support of Its Pre-Answer Motion to Dismiss at Doc. 19-2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 06/24/2019. (jjh)
June 19, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Pre-Answer Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint and Brief by Defendant Mediacom Communications Corporation, LLC (Attachments: #1 Amended Motion, #2 (FILED IN ERROR Brief) (Nass, Mitchell) Modified text on 6/25/2019 (des)
June 18, 2019 Filing 18 REPLY BRIEF to #7 Motion to Dismiss by Mediacom Communications Corporation, LLC. (filed by clerk pursuant to #17 Order) (des)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave to File Overlength Brief. The Clerk of Court is directed to detach and separately docket Mediacoms Reply Brief (docket no. 15-1). Signed by Judge Linda R Reade on 06/17/2019. (jjh)
June 14, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Defendant Mediacom Communications Corporation, LLC Responses due by 6/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Brief) (Nass, Mitchell) Modified text on 6/16/2019 (des)
June 14, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to File Overlength Brief (Unopposed) by Defendant Mediacom Communications Corporation, LLC (Attachments: #1 Reply Brief) (Nass, Mitchell)
June 10, 2019 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Deborah Hornbuckle. ****PLEASE MAKE COPY OF SUMMONS AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 Civil Removal Actions new case packet) (des)
June 7, 2019 Filing 13 RESISTANCE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Jayson Gearhart. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Resistance, #2 Exhibit 1 to Brief, #3 Exhibit 2 to Brief, #4 Exhibit 3 to Brief) (Kaspar, Bradley)
June 6, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED Complaint Jury Demand against Mediacom Communications Corporation, LLC, Deborah Hornbuckle, filed by Jayson Gearhart. (Kaspar, Bradley)
May 31, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Mediacom Communications Corporation, LLC identifying Corporate Parent JMCC Corporation, Other Affiliate Mediacom Iowa LLC, Other Affiliate Mediacom LLC for Mediacom Communications Corporation, LLC. (Nass, Mitchell)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 UNRESISTED Motion for Extension of time to Resist Defendant's #7 Motion to Dismiss filed by Jayson Gearhart: Responses due by 6/7/2019. Signed by Judge Linda R Reade on 05/29/2019. (jjh)
May 29, 2019 Filing 9 UNRESISTED Motion for Extension of time to Resist Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Jayson Gearhart (Kaspar, Bradley)
May 29, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley J Kaspar on behalf of Jayson Gearhart. Withdrawal of Victoria D Noel. (Kaspar, Bradley)
May 16, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Mediacom Communications Corporation, LLC. Responses due by 5/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support) (Nass, Mitchell) Modified text on 5/16/2019 (des)
May 10, 2019 Set Deadline: Defendant LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 5/31/2019 (des)
May 10, 2019 Filing 6 DOCKET Annotation: Please find Civil Removal Actions new case packet attachment (eAtty Noel) (des)
May 10, 2019 Filing 5 STATE Court Petition with Jury Demand by Jayson Gearhart (eAtty Noel) (des)
May 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE to Attorney Victoria D Noel Not Admitted to Practice in the United States Court for the Northern District of Iowa (eAtty Noel) (des) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/21/2019: #1 Receipt Confirmation) (des).
May 10, 2019 Judge Linda R Reade and Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. Clerk checked for conflicts as to parties and attorneys - none found. (des)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Filing by Mediacom Communications Corporation, LLC (Attachments: #1 Ex. A) (Nass, Mitchell)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Mediacom Communications Corporation Certificate Pursuant to L.R. 81 (Nass, Mitchell)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Linn County, case number EQCV092548. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2936901), filed by Mediacom Communications Corporation. Scheduling Report due by 7/8/2019 (Attachments: #1 Ex. A, #2 Ex. B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Nass, Mitchell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gearhart v. Mediacom Communications Corporation, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mediacom Communications Corporation, LLC
Represented By: Mitchell G Nass
Represented By: Michael A Giudicessi
Represented By: Chanelle Han
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Hornbuckle
Represented By: Michael A Giudicessi
Represented By: Chanelle Han
Represented By: Mitchell G Nass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jayson Gearhart
Represented By: Victoria D Noel
Represented By: Bradley J Kaspar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?