GenoSource, LLC v. Inguran, LLC
Plaintiff: GenoSource, LLC
Defendant: Inguran, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00059
Filed: May 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly KE Mahoney
Referring Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Unresisted Motion to Stay Case and Vacate Hearing Dates. See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 7/10/2019. (SAM)
July 10, 2019 Filing 17 Joint UNRESISTED Motion for Stay and to Vacate Hearing Dates and Deadlines by Plaintiff GenoSource, LLC (Hill, Timothy)
July 3, 2019 Reset Deadlines pursuant to 16 Text Order: Inguran, LLC response to #1 Complaint due 7/22/2019. (SAM) Modified text on 7/5/2019 (skm).
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 **TEXT ORDER ONLY** granting #15 Unresisted Motion to Reset Deadline. Defendant's response to plaintiff's complaint is due by July 22, 2019. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 7/3/2019. (SAM) Modified on 7/3/2019 (SAM).
July 3, 2019 Filing 15 UNRESISTED Motion for Extension of Deadline to Respond to Complaint by Defendant Inguran, LLC (Gray, Angela) Modified text on 7/5/2019 (skm).
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Setting Hearing on #13 Oral Argument Requested - MOTION to Stay re #1 Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 7/26/2019 9:00 AM in Ctrm 3 (4th Floor) Cedar Rapids before Judge CJ Williams. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 7/1/2019. (src)
June 28, 2019 Filing 13 Oral Argument Requested - MOTION to Stay re #1 Complaint by Defendant Inguran, LLC (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration) (Linebaugh, Jesse)
June 13, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by GenoSource, LLC identifying Corporate Parent GenoSource, LLC for GenoSource, LLC. (Hill, Timothy)
June 7, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines pursuant to Order at Doc. 11: Inguran, LLC response to Complaint due 7/8/2019. Joint Scheduling Report due by 9/11/2019. (SAM)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 **TEXT ORDER ONLY** granting #10 Unresisted Motion to Reset Deadlines. Defendant's deadline to respond to plaintiff's Complaint is July 8, 2019. The deadline for the parties to submit their proposed scheduling order is September 11, 2019. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 6/7/2019. (SAM)
June 6, 2019 Filing 10 Joint UNRESISTED Motion for Resetting Deadlines by Plaintiff GenoSource, LLC (Hill, Timothy)
May 24, 2019 Filing 9 *TEXT ORDER ONLY* granting #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Holly A. Harrison (pro hac vice fee previously paid in 18-cv-113), #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael L. Rice (pro hac vice fee previously paid in 18-cv-113), #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David G. Jorgensen (pro hac vice fee previously paid in 18-cv-113), and #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Katherine A. Garceau Sobiech (pro hac vice fee previously paid in 18-cv-113). Upon review of the motions and the certificates of good standing, the court finds the motions should be granted. It is so ordered that Attorneys Holly A Harrison, Michael L Rice, David G Jorgensen, and Kathrine A Garceau Sobiech are authorized to appear on behalf of Plaintiff GenoSource, LLC. Signed by Clerk on 5/24/2019. (pac)
May 23, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Katherine A. Garceau Sobiech (pro hac vice fee previously paid in 18-cv-113) by Plaintiff GenoSource, LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Hill, Timothy)
May 23, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David G. Jorgensen (pro hac vice fee previously paid in 18-cv-113) by Plaintiff GenoSource, LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Hill, Timothy)
May 23, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael L. Rice (pro hac vice fee previously paid in 18-cv-113) by Plaintiff GenoSource, LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Hill, Timothy)
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Holly A. Harrison (pro hac vice fee previously paid in 18-cv-113) by Plaintiff GenoSource, LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Hill, Timothy)
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GenoSource, LLC. Inguran, LLC served on 5/23/2019, answer due 6/13/2019. (Hill, Timothy)
May 23, 2019 Set Deadline: Plaintiff's LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 6/13/2019. (skm)
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Inguran, LLC. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Civil Case Packet) (skm)
May 23, 2019 Judge CJ Williams and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney added. Conflicts checked; none found. (skm)
May 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by David Michael Caves on behalf of GenoSource, LLC. (Caves, David)
May 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT With Jury Demand against Inguran, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2945434.), filed by GenoSource, LLC. Scheduling Report due by 8/21/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hill, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GenoSource, LLC v. Inguran, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GenoSource, LLC
Represented By: Timothy J Hill
Represented By: David Michael Caves
Represented By: Holly Ann Harrison
Represented By: David Gavin Jorgensen
Represented By: Michael Lyn Rice
Represented By: Katherine Anne Garceau Sobiech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inguran, LLC
Represented By: Angela J Gray
Represented By: Jesse Linebaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?