Trustees of the Iowa Iron Workers Heavy Highway Defined Benefit Pension Fund et al v. Calacci Construction Co, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Iron Workers Heavy Highway Defined Contribution Plan, Trustees of the Iowa Iron Workers Heavy Highway Defined Benefit Pension Fund and Trustees of the Northeast Iowa Ironworkers Local 89 Joint Apprenticeship Training Committee Trust
Defendant: Calacci Construction Co, Inc and MPCC, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00066
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Linda R Reade
Referring Judge: Mark A Roberts
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1145
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 DEFAULT Entry as to Defendants Calacci Construction Co, Inc, MPCC, LLC, granting #7 Motion. Signed by Clerk on 8/13/2019. (copy w/nef to defaulted defendants) (des)
August 12, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Default Entry against Calacci Construction Co., Inc.; MPCC, LLC, D/B/A Interstate Reinforcing Steel by Plaintiffs Trustees of the Iowa Iron Workers Heavy Highway Defined Benefit Pension Fund, Trustees of the Iron Workers Heavy Highway Defined Contribution Plan, Trustees of the Northeast Iowa Ironworkers Local 89 Joint Apprenticeship Training Committee Trust (Germaine, Jennifer)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trustees of the Iowa Iron Workers Heavy Highway Defined Benefit Pension Fund, Trustees of the Northeast Iowa Ironworkers Local 89 Joint Apprenticeship Training Committee Trust, Trustees of the Iron Workers Heavy Highway Defined Contribution Plan. All Defendants. (Germaine, Jennifer)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Trustees of the Iowa Iron Workers Heavy Highway Defined Benefit Pension Fund, Trustees of the Iron Workers Heavy Highway Defined Contribution Plan, Trustees of the Northeast Iowa Ironworkers Local 89 Joint Apprenticeship Training Committee Trust (Germaine, Jennifer)
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David J Fournier on behalf of Plaintiffs Trustees of the Iowa Iron Workers Heavy Highway Defined Benefit Pension Fund, Trustees of the Iron Workers Heavy Highway Defined Contribution Plan, Trustees of the Northeast Iowa Ironworkers Local 89 Joint Apprenticeship Training Committee Trust. Upon a review of the Motion and the Certificate of Good Standing, the court finds the Motion should be granted. Signed by Clerk on 6/26/2019. (des)
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David J. Fournier ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2968103) by Plaintiffs Trustees of the Iowa Iron Workers Heavy Highway Defined Benefit Pension Fund, Trustees of the Iron Workers Heavy Highway Defined Contribution Plan, Trustees of the Northeast Iowa Ironworkers Local 89 Joint Apprenticeship Training Committee Trust (Germaine, Jennifer)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Calacci Construction Co, Inc, MPCC, LLC. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 Civil Actions new case packet) (des)
June 21, 2019 Set Deadline: Plaintiff LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 7/12/2019 (des)
June 21, 2019 Judge Linda R Reade and Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. Clerk checked for conflicts as to parties and attorney - none found. (des)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2965470.), filed by Trustees of the Iowa Iron Workers Heavy Highway Defined Benefit Pension Fund, Trustees of the Northeast Iowa Ironworkers Local 89 Joint Apprenticeship Training Committee Trust, Trustees of the Iron Workers Heavy Highway Defined Contribution Plan. Scheduling Report due by 9/18/2019 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Germaine, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of the Iowa Iron Workers Heavy Highway Defined Benefit Pension Fund et al v. Calacci Construction Co, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calacci Construction Co, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MPCC, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Iron Workers Heavy Highway Defined Contribution Plan
Represented By: Jennifer Ellen Germaine
Represented By: David John Fournier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Iowa Iron Workers Heavy Highway Defined Benefit Pension Fund
Represented By: Jennifer Ellen Germaine
Represented By: David John Fournier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Northeast Iowa Ironworkers Local 89 Joint Apprenticeship Training Committee Trust
Represented By: Jennifer Ellen Germaine
Represented By: David John Fournier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?