Brett Brecke et al. v. Ryan & Associates, Inc.
Plaintiff: Brett Brecke and Joe Ockenfels, their capacity as the Trustees for the U.A. Local 125 Health and Welfare Fund, the U.A. Local 125 Retirement Savings Plan and the U.A. Local 125 Vacation Fund, and each, Brett Brecke and Joe Ockenfels
Defendant: Ryan & Associates, Inc. and Ryan & Associates, Inc
Case Number: 1:2019cv00068
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly KE Mahoney
Referring Judge: Linda R Reade
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Pamela Nissen on behalf of Plaintiffs Brett Brecke and Joe Ockenfels. Upon a review of the Motion and #9 Certificate of Good Standing, the court finds the Motion should be granted. Signed by Clerk on 7/29/2019. (mmc)
July 26, 2019 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENT/ADDENDUM #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Pamela Nissen ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2981572) by Brett Brecke, Joe Ockenfels (Germaine, Jennifer)
July 19, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Ryan & Associates, Inc (Schiltz, Mikkie)
July 19, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Ryan & Associates, Inc.(Schiltz, Mikkie)
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Mikkie R Schiltz on behalf of Ryan & Associates, Inc. (Schiltz, Mikkie)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Pamela Nissen ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2981572) by Plaintiffs Brett Brecke, Joe Ockenfels (Germaine, Jennifer)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Brett Brecke, Joe Ockenfels (Germaine, Jennifer)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Ockenfels, Brett Brecke. Ryan & Associates, Inc. served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. (Germaine, Jennifer)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Ryan & Associates, Inc.. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Civil Case Packet) (mmc)
June 26, 2019 Judge Linda R Reade and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney added. Conflicts checked as to parties and attorney; none found. (mmc)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ryan & Associates, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2968439.), filed by Brett Brecke and Joe Ockenfels, their capacity as the Trustees for the U.A. Local 125 Health and Welfare Fund, the U.A. Local 125 Retirement Savings Plan and the U.A. Local 125 Vacation Fund. Scheduling Report due by 9/23/2019 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Germaine, Jennifer) Modified text on 6/26/2019 (mmc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brett Brecke et al. v. Ryan & Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brett Brecke and Joe Ockenfels, their capacity as the Trustees for the U.A. Local 125 Health and Welfare Fund, the U.A. Local 125 Retirement Savings Plan and the U.A. Local 125 Vacation Fund, and each
Represented By: Jennifer Ellen Germaine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brett Brecke
Represented By: Pamela Nissen
Represented By: Jennifer Ellen Germaine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Ockenfels
Represented By: Pamela Nissen
Represented By: Jennifer Ellen Germaine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan & Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan & Associates, Inc
Represented By: Mikkie R Schiltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?