Beardsley v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Kathleen Lynne Beardsley
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2019cv00069
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Referring Judge: Leonard T Strand
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kathleen Lynne Beardsley (Osterhout, Karl)
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Ammann Carrington on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security. (Carrington, Melissa)
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Social Security Case Packet) (skm)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Kathleen Lynne Beardsley. Dismissal Deadline 10/23/2019 (filed by Clerk per #4 Order). (skm)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The clerk is ordered to file the complaint and issue a summons. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 7/12/2019. (skm)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 ***TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on the Motion for Leaveto Appear Pro Hac Vice #2 for Attorney Karl E Osterhout on behalf of Plaintiff Kathleen Lynne Beardsley. Upon a review of the Motion and the Certificate of Good Standing, the court finds the Motion should be granted. Signed by Clerk on 7/9/2019. (ksy)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Karl E. Osterhout ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2975025) by Plaintiff Kathleen Lynne Beardsley (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Osterhout, Karl)
July 2, 2019 Chief Judge Leonard T Strand and Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added (no conflicts identified). #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred to Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts. (pac)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Kathleen Lynne Beardsley (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Engler, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beardsley v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Melissa Ammann Carrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Lynne Beardsley
Represented By: Robert J Engler
Represented By: Karl E Osterhout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?