Crosser v. Iowa, State of et al
Plaintiff: Skylar Crosser
Defendant: Jerry Foxhoven, Iowa, State of and Iowa Department of Human Services
Case Number: 1:2019cv00082
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Referring Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 PRO SE Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Skylar Crosser (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter & Envelope) (NEF mailed to Plt). (skm)
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Skylar Crosser. Iowa Department of Human Services and Iowa, State of served on 7/25/2019 (NEF mailed to Plt). (skm)
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance and Waiver of Service of Summons by Gary J Otting on behalf of Iowa Department of Human Services and Iowa, State of. (Otting, Gary) Modified text on 8/13/2019 (skm).
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendants Iowa Department of Human Services and Iowa, State of. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of State's Motion to Dismiss) (Otting, Gary) Modified text on 8/13/2019 (skm).
July 24, 2019 Filing 3 PRO SE DEMAND for Trial by Jury re #1 Complaint by Skylar Crosser (NEF to Plt at counter). (skm)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Jerry Foxhoven, Iowa Department of Human Services, Iowa, State of. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Civil Case Packet) (copy w/NEF to Plt at counter) (skm)
July 24, 2019 FEE Receipt: $400.00, receipt number IAN110025150 for new civil case filing fee by Skylar Crosser (NEF w/receipt to Plt at counter). (skm)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT against Jerry Foxhoven, Iowa Department of Human Services, Iowa, State of, filed by Skylar Crosser. Scheduling Report due by 10/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (NEF to Plt at counter). (skm)
July 24, 2019 Judge CJ Williams and Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. Conflicts checked; none found. (skm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crosser v. Iowa, State of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Foxhoven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iowa, State of
Represented By: Gary J Otting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iowa Department of Human Services
Represented By: Gary J Otting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Skylar Crosser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?