Kemp v. Rockwell Collins, Inc
Plaintiff: Nicole L Kemp
Defendant: Rockwell Collins, Inc
Case Number: 1:2019cv00092
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly KE Mahoney
Referring Judge: Linda R Reade
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Filing 12 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Misty R Martin on behalf of Defendant Rockwell Collins Inc. Upon a review of the Motion and the Certificate of Good Standing, the court finds the Motion should be granted. Signed by Clerk on 10/25/2019. (des)
October 24, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Misty R. Martin ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-3048461) by Defendant Rockwell Collins, Inc (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Martin, Misty)
October 14, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint by Rockwell Collins, Inc.(Cartmill, Espnola)
September 30, 2019 Filing 9 SECOND AMENDED Petition with Jury Demand against Rockwell Collins, Inc, filed by Nicole L Kemp. (jjh)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Amend/Correct Petition at Law. Clerk of Court shall detach and docket the amended petition (Doc. 7-1). Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 9/30/2019. (jjh)
September 11, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Amend/Correct Petition at Law by Plaintiff Nicole L Kemp. (Attachments: #1 Second Amended Petition at Law) (Olson, Anthony) Modified text on 9/12/2019 (des)
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Rockwell Collins, Inc identifying Corporate Parent United Technologies Corporation, Other Affiliate State Street Corporation for Rockwell Collins, Inc. (Cartmill, Espnola)
September 5, 2019 Set Deadline: Defendant LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 9/26/2019 (des)
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 DOCKET Annotation: Please find Civil Removal Actions new case packet attached (des)
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED STATE Court Petition with Jury Demand by Nicole L Kemp (des)
September 5, 2019 Filing 3 STATE Court Petition and Request for Jury Trial by Nicole L Kemp (des)
September 5, 2019 Judge Linda R Reade and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney added. No conflicts identified. (des)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by Rockwell Collins, Inc.(Cartmill, Espnola) Modified text on 9/5/2019 (des)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from In the Iowa District Court for Linn County, case number LACV093065. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-3012993), filed by Rockwell Collins, Inc. Scheduling Report due by 11/4/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Rule 81.1 Certificate) (Cartmill, Espnola)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kemp v. Rockwell Collins, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole L Kemp
Represented By: Anthony J Olson
Represented By: Nathan T Willems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockwell Collins, Inc
Represented By: Espnola F Cartmill
Represented By: Misty Rose Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?