Jackson Jr v. Cedar Rapids Child Support Recovery Unit et al
Plaintiff: William Henry Jackson Jr
Defendant: Cedar Rapids Child Support Recovery Unit, Brian Gardner, Linn County Domestic Relations and Jane Spande
Case Number: 1:2019cv00099
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Referring Judge: Leonard T Strand
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 6 JUDGMENT in favor Defendants against Plaintiff William Henry Jackson, Jr. Plaintiff take nothing and these actions are dismissed. Signed by Clerk on 10/08/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00099-LTS-MAR, 1:19-cv-00108-LTS-KEM, 1:19-cv-00109-LTS-MAR (copy w/nef to non-ecf filer) (des)
October 8, 2019 Filing 5 PRO SE COMPLAINT against All Defendants by William Henry Jackson, Jr (filed by clerk pursuant to #4 Order) (nef to non-ecf filer) (des)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Dismissing Cases: Plaintiff's motions to proceed in forma pauperis (C19-0099-LTS, Doc. No. #1 , C19-0108-LTS, Doc. No. 2 and C19-0109-LTS, Doc. No. 2) are granted. The clerks office is directed to file the complaints. Plaintiff has failed to state a claim upon which relief can be granted in each case. Accordingly, his three complaints are denied, and each case is dismissed. Plaintiffs motion to file electronically (C19-0099-LTS, Doc. No. #2 ) is denied as moot. Signed by Chief Judge Leonard T Strand on 10/08/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00099-LTS-MAR, 1:19-cv-00108-LTS-KEM, 1:19-cv-00109-LTS-MAR (copy w/nef to non-ecf filer) (des)
September 30, 2019 Filing 3 PRO SE SUPPLEMENT #1 -1 Complaint by William Henry Jackson, Jr. (Copy given to plaintiff at counter) (pac)
September 27, 2019 Filing 2 PRO SE MOTION to File Electronically and Miscellaneous Relief by Plaintiff William Henry Jackson, Jr (NEF mailed to Pltf) (jjh)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 PRO SE MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff William Henry Jackson Jr (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (NEF mailed to Pltf) (jjh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson Jr v. Cedar Rapids Child Support Recovery Unit et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cedar Rapids Child Support Recovery Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linn County Domestic Relations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Spande
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Henry Jackson Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?