Techau et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Alexis Techau and Dannish Robertson
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv00107
Filed: October 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2671
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 11, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alexis Techau. United States of America served on 10/9/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. (Bunger, Darwin)
October 30, 2019 TEXT ORDER: The matter before the court on the #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Zev T. Gershon and, #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Randal D. Getz on behalf of Plaintiffs. Upon review of the Motions and the Certificates of Good Standing, the court finds the Motions should be granted. Signed by Clerk on 10/30/2019. (conflicts checked, none found) (jjh)
October 29, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Randal D. Getz ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-3051397) by Plaintiff Alexis Techau (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Getz, Randal)
October 29, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Zev T. Gershon ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-3051356) by Plaintiff Alexis Techau (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Gershon, Zev)
October 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob A Schunk on behalf of United States of America. (Schunk, Jacob)
October 4, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to United States of America. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Civil Case Packet) (skm)
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status by 11/3/2019. (skm)
October 4, 2019 Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. Conflicts checked; none found. (skm)
October 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against United States of America (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-3034901), filed by Alexis Techau and Dannish Robertson. Scheduling Report due by 1/1/2020.(Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bunger, Darwin) Modified on 10/4/2019 to correct dismissal deadline to scheduling report deadline (skm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Techau et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexis Techau
Represented By: Darwin Bunger
Represented By: Randal D Getz
Represented By: Zev T Gershon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dannish Robertson
Represented By: Randal D Getz
Represented By: Darwin Bunger
Represented By: Zev T Gershon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Jacob A Schunk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?