Yennie v. Gardner et al
Petitioner: Joseph Howard Yennie
Respondent: Brian D Gardner and Linn County, Iowa
Case Number: 1:2019cv00111
Filed: October 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Referring Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Judge CJ Williams and Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. No conflicts identified. (des)
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:19-cv-02418. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. NORTHERN DISTRICT OF IOWA DOCKET BEGINS HERE (docket report to pro se petitioner) (PSLC notified) Modified on 10/8/2019 (des)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Transferring this petition to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Iowa. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 10/1/2019. (SMD) cc: Howard. Modified text on 10/4/2019 (MTP). [Transferred from Minnesota on 10/8/2019.]
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (filing fee $5, receipt number 3-15686) filed by Joseph Howard. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (JGK) cc: Howard. Document QC'd on 9/18/2019 (JGK). [Transferred from Minnesota on 10/8/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yennie v. Gardner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brian D Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Linn County, Iowa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joseph Howard Yennie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?