Van Fossen v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Shawn L Van Fossen
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2019cv00112
Filed: October 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob A Schunk on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security. (Schunk, Jacob)
October 10, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Case Packet) (jjh)
October 10, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Shawn L Van Fossen. Dismissal Deadline 1/21/2020 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jjh)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff. The clerk is ordered to file the complaint and issue a summons. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 10/10/2019. (jjh)
October 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 11/8/2019. (kms)
October 9, 2019 Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts. No conflicts identified. Attorney admissions verified. (kms)
October 8, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Shawn L Van Fossen (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kappelman, Wes)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Van Fossen v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn L Van Fossen
Represented By: Corbett Allen Luedeman
Represented By: Wes Kappelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Jacob A Schunk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?