Yakish v. Smith
Plaintiff: Bruce Yakish and Bryce Yakish
Defendant: Robert Smith
Case Number: 1:2019cv00120
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly KE Mahoney
Referring Judge: Linda R Reade
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2019 Judge Linda R Reade added (no conflicts identified). Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney no longer assigned to case as presider. (pac)
November 27, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Robert Smith.(Siefert, Nicholas)
October 31, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE To Attorney Not Admitted to Practice in the United States District Court for the Northern District of Iowa. (State Court Petition, New Removal Case Packet, Notice of Assignment to US Magistrate Judge, and Notice of Attorney Not Admitted e-mailed to Atty Cole) (mmc)
October 31, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 11/30/2019. (mmc)
October 31, 2019 Filing 3 DOCKET Annotation: Please find New Removal Case Packet Attached. (mmc)
October 31, 2019 Filing 2 STATE Court Petition With Jury Demand by Bryce Yakish. (mmc)
October 31, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney. Conflicts checked; none found. (mmc)
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Cedar County District Court, case number LACV036333. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-3052605), filed by Robert Smith. Scheduling Report due by 12/30/2019 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 LR 81 Statement, #3 State Court Pleadings) (Siefert, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yakish v. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Yakish
Represented By: Martin A Diaz
Represented By: M Victoria Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryce Yakish
Represented By: Martin A Diaz
Represented By: Maria Victoria Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Smith
Represented By: Nicholas Easton Siefert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?