2020 Annual Attorney Fee
In Re: 2020 Annual Attorney Fee
Case Number: 1:2020af09999
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Clerk
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 63 Annual Admission Fee of $25 paid. Receipt #0862-2983497. This was a duplicate payment made in 2019 and credited to 2020 annual admission fee for Jerry L. Schnurr, III. (ksy)
July 12, 2019 Filing 62 Annual Admission Fee of $25 paid. Receipt #0862-2978549. This was a duplicate payment made in 2019 and credited to 2020 annual admission fee for Blake Parker. (ksy)
July 8, 2019 Filing 61 Annual Admission Fee of $25 paid. Receipt #0862-2974759. This was a duplicate payment made in 2019 and credited to 2020 annual admission fee for Peter J. Leehey. (ksy)
July 2, 2019 Filing 60 Annual Admission Fee of $25 paid. Receipt #0862-2972274. This was a duplicate payment made in 2019 and credited to 2020 annual admission fee for Kevin Christian Rigdon. (ksy)
June 26, 2019 Filing 59 Annual Admission Fee of $25 paid. Receipt #0862-2969516. This was a duplicate payment made in 2019 and credited to 2020 annual admission fee for Brett (Michael) Ryan. (ksy)
June 26, 2019 Filing 58 Annual Admission Fee of $25 paid. Receipt #0862-2969369. This was a duplicate payment made in 2019 and credited to 2020 annual admission fee for Matthew James Reilly. (ksy)
June 26, 2019 Filing 57 Annual Admission Fee of $25 paid. Receipt #0862-2968613. This was a duplicate payment made in 2019 and credited to 2020 annual admission fee for Dustin M. Mueller. (ksy)
June 25, 2019 Filing 56 Annual Admission Fee of $25 paid. Receipt #0862-2967536. This was a duplicate payment made in 2019 and credited to 2020 annual admission fee for Glen Stephen Downey. (ksy)
June 24, 2019 Filing 55 Annual Admission Fee of $25 paid. Receipt #0862-2967041. This was a duplicate payment made in 2019 and credited to 2020 annual admission fee for Jenna Lee Green. (ksy)
June 24, 2019 Filing 54 Annual Admission Fee of $25 paid. Receipt #0862-2966797. This was a duplicate payment made in 2019 and credited to 2020 annual admission fee for Kenneth r. Munro. (ksy)
June 23, 2019 Filing 53 Annual Admission Fee of $25 paid. Receipt #0862-2966537. This was a duplicate payment made in 2019 and credited to 2020 annual admission fee for Molly R. Hamilton Cawley. (ksy)
June 21, 2019 Filing 52 Annual Admission Fee of $25 paid. Receipt #0862-2966367. This was a duplicate payment made in 2019 and credited to 2020 annual admission fee for Joel Edward Fenton. (ksy)
June 21, 2019 Filing 51 Annual Admission Fee of $25 paid. Receipt #0862-2966330. This was a duplicate payment made in 2019 and credited to 2020 annual admission fee for Zachary David Clausen. (ksy)
June 21, 2019 Filing 50 Annual Admission Fee of $25 paid. Receipt #0862-2966241. This was a duplicate payment made in 2019 and credited to 2020 annual admission fee for Ronald Edward Langford. (ksy)
June 21, 2019 Filing 49 Annual Admission Fee of $25 paid. Receipt #0862-. This was a duplicate payment made in 2019 and credited to 2020 annual admission fee for Thomas Mark Crawford. (ksy)
June 21, 2019 Filing 48 Annual Admission Fee of $25 paid. Receipt #0862-2965862. This was a duplicate payment made in 2019 and credited to 2020 annual admission fee for Robert Benjamin Stone. (ksy)
June 21, 2019 Filing 47 Annual Admission Fee of $25 paid. Receipt #0862-2965859. This was a duplicate payment made in 2019 and credited to 2020 annual admission fee for Kyle R. Day. (ksy)
June 21, 2019 Filing 46 Annual Admission Fee of $25 paid. Receipt #0862-2965815. This was a duplicate payment made in 2019 and credited to 2020 annual admission fee for Craig Alan Stokes. (ksy)
June 21, 2019 Filing 45 Annual Admission Fee of $25 paid. Receipt #0862-2965699. This was a duplicate payment made in 2019 and credited to 2020 annual admission fee for Brian James Lalor. (ksy)
June 20, 2019 Filing 44 Annual Admission Fee of $25 paid. Receipt #0862-2965656. This was a duplicate payment made in 2019 and credited to 2020 annual admission fee for Nicholas Scott Matney. (ksy)
June 20, 2019 Filing 43 Annual Admission Fee of $25 paid. Receipt #0862-2965535. This was a duplicate payment made in 2019 and credited to 2020 annual admission fee for Corbett Allen Luedeman. (ksy)
June 20, 2019 Filing 42 Annual Admission Fee of $25 paid. Receipt #0862-2965529. This was a duplicate payment made in 2019 and credited to 2020 annual admission fee for John Alan Hathaway. (ksy)
June 20, 2019 Filing 41 Annual Admission Fee of $25 paid. Receipt #0862-2965530. This was a duplicate payment made in 2019 and credited to 2020 annual admission fee for Adam James Babinat. (ksy)
June 20, 2019 Filing 40 Annual Admission Fee of $25 paid. Receipt #0862-2965525. This was a duplicate payment made in 2019 and credited to 2020 annual admission fee for Clemens Erdahl. (ksy)
June 20, 2019 Filing 39 Annual Admission Fee of $25 paid. Receipt #0862-2965524. This was a duplicate payment made in 2019 and credited to 2020 annual admission fee for David t. Bower. (ksy)
June 20, 2019 Filing 38 Annual Admission Fee of $25 paid. Receipt #0862-2965523. This was a duplicate payment made in 2019 and credited to 2020 annual admission fee for Dylan J. Thomas. (ksy)
June 20, 2019 Filing 37 Annual Admission Fee of $25 paid. Receipt #0862-2965518. This was a duplicate payment made in 2019 and credited to 2020 annual admission fee for Lori Lee Nelson. (ksy)
May 30, 2019 Filing 36 Annual Admission Fee of $25 paid. Receipt #0862-2949925. This was a duplicate payment made in 2019 and credited to 2020 annual admission fee for Dillon Johnathan Besser. (ksy)
May 30, 2019 Filing 35 Annual Admission Fee of $25 paid. Receipt #0862-2949902. This was a duplicate payment made in 2019 and credited to 2020 annual admission fee for Dan Childers. (ksy)
April 18, 2019 Filing 34 Annual Admission Fee of $25 paid. Receipt #0862-2921734. This was a duplicate payment made in 2019 and credited to 2020 annual admission fee for Ryan Matthew Sewell. (ksy)
April 11, 2019 Filing 33 Annual Admission Fee of $25 paid. Receipt #0862-2916069. This was a duplicate payment made in 2019 and credited to 2020 annual admission fee for John J. Bishop. (ksy)
April 1, 2019 Filing 32 Annual Admission Fee of $25 paid. Receipt #0862-2908695. This was a duplicate payment made in 2019 and credited to 2020 annual admission fee for Michael Owen Carpenter. (ksy)
March 1, 2019 Filing 31 Annual Admission Fee of $25 paid. Receipt #0862-2886940. This was a duplicate payment made in 2019 and credited to 2020 annual admission fee for Nicholas C. Rowley. (ksy)
February 28, 2019 Filing 30 Annual Admission Fee of $25 paid. Receipt #0862-2885210. This was a duplicate payment made in 2019 and credited to 2020 annual admission fee for Mark E. Spellman. (ksy)
February 26, 2019 Filing 29 Annual Admission Fee of $25 paid. Receipt #0862-2882911. This was a duplicate payment made in 2019 and credited to 2020 annual admission fee for Nathaniel Nieman. (ksy)
February 26, 2019 Filing 28 Annual Admission Fee of $25 paid. Receipt #0862-2882148. This was a duplicate payment made in 2019 and credited to 2020 annual admission fee for Matthew Alan Warner-Blankenship. (ksy)
February 26, 2019 Filing 27 Annual Admission Fee of $25 paid. Receipt #0862-2882056. This was a duplicate payment made in 2019 and credited to 2020 annual admission fee for Christopher P Jannes. (ksy)
February 25, 2019 Filing 26 Annual Admission Fee of $25 paid. Receipt #0862-2881549. This was a duplicate payment made in 2019 and credited to 2020 annual admission fee for Thomas James Bullock. (ksy)
February 19, 2019 Filing 25 Annual Admission Fee of $25 paid. Receipt #0862-2876879. This was a duplicate payment made in 2019 and credited to 2020 annual admission fee for JD Haas. (ksy)
February 18, 2019 Filing 24 Annual Admission Fee of $25 paid. Receipt #0862-2875644. This was a duplicate payment made in 2019 and credited to 2020 annual admission fee for Julie J. McLean. (ksy)
February 18, 2019 Filing 23 Annual Admission Fee of $25 paid. Receipt #0862-2875579. This was a duplicate payment made in 2019 and credited to 2020 annual admission fee for Marcia Ann Washkuhn. (ksy)
February 15, 2019 Filing 22 Annual Admission Fee of $25 paid. Receipt #0862-2875394. This was a duplicate payment made in 2019 and credited to 2020 annual admission fee for Tara Z. Hall. (ksy)
February 15, 2019 Filing 21 Annual Admission Fee of $25 paid. Receipt #0862-2875389. This was a duplicate payment made in 2019 and credited to 2020 annual admission fee for Scott M. Brennan. (ksy)
February 15, 2019 Filing 20 Annual Admission Fee of $25 paid. Receipt #0862-2875384. This was a duplicate payment made in 2019 and credited to 2020 annual admission fee for Michele L. Brott. (ksy)
February 15, 2019 Filing 19 Annual Admission Fee of $25 paid. Receipt #0862-2875304. This was a duplicate payment made in 2019 and credited to 2020 annual admission fee for Elizabeth R. Meyer. (ksy)
February 15, 2019 Filing 18 Annual Admission Fee of $25 paid. Receipt #0862-2875293. This was a duplicate payment made in 2019 and credited to 2020 annual admission fee for Christopher P. Jannes. (ksy)
February 15, 2019 Filing 17 Annual Admission Fee of $25 paid. Receipt #0862-2874851. This was a duplicate payment made in 2019 and credited to 2020 annual admission fee for Edward J. Keane. (ksy)
February 14, 2019 Filing 16 Annual Admission Fee of $25 paid. Receipt #0862-2873958. This was a duplicate payment made in 2019 and credited to 2020 annual admission fee for Cory Ryan Thein. (ksy)
February 14, 2019 Filing 15 Annual Admission Fee of $25 paid. Receipt #0862-2873844. This was a duplicate payment made in 2019 and credited to 2020 annual admission fee for Hugh M. Field. (ksy)
February 13, 2019 Filing 14 Annual Admission Fee of $25 paid. Receipt #0862-2872552. This was a duplicate payment made in 2019 and credited to 2020 annual admission fee for Jason D. Keck. (ksy)
February 12, 2019 Filing 13 Annual Admission Fee of $25 paid. Receipt #0862-2871975. This was a duplicate payment made in 2019 and credited to 2020 annual admission fee for Todd w. Weidemann. (ksy)
February 12, 2019 Filing 12 Annual Admission Fee of $25 paid. Receipt #0862-2871955. This was a duplicate payment made in 2019 and credited to 2020 annual admission fee for Patrick T Vint. (ksy)
February 11, 2019 Filing 11 Annual Admission Fee of $25 paid. Receipt #0862-2869847. This was a duplicate payment made in 2019 and credited to 2020 annual admission fee for Robert VP Waterman, Jr. (ksy)
February 10, 2019 Filing 10 Annual Admission Fee of $25 paid. Receipt #0862-2869271. This was a duplicate payment made in 2019 and credited to 2020 annual admission fee for Glenn A. Metcalf. (ksy)
February 8, 2019 Filing 9 Annual Admission Fee of $25 paid. Receipt #0862-2868378. This was a duplicate payment made in 2019 and credited to 2020 annual admission fee for John Mandel Sandy. (ksy)
February 7, 2019 Filing 8 Annual Admission Fee of $25 paid. Receipt #0862-2867902. This was a duplicate payment made in 2019 and credited to 2020 annual admission fee for Douglas L. Roehrich. (ksy)
February 7, 2019 Filing 7 Annual Admission Fee of $25 paid. Receipt #0862-2857817. This was a duplicate payment made in 2019 and credited to 2020 annual admission fee for Brian J. Kane. (ksy)
February 5, 2019 Filing 6 Annual Admission Fee of $25 paid. Receipt #0862-2865040. This was a duplicate payment made in 2019 and credited to 2020 annual admission fee for Susan M Hess. (ksy)
February 4, 2019 Filing 5 Annual Admission Fee of $25 paid. Receipt #0862-2863607. This was a duplicate payment made in 2019 and credited to 2020 annual admission fee for Sarah J. Millsap. (ksy)
January 29, 2019 Filing 4 Annual Admission Fee of $25 paid. Receipt #0862-2859759. This was a duplicate payment made in 2019 and credited to 2020 annual admission fee for David Alan Morse. (ksy)
January 29, 2019 Filing 3 Annual Admission Fee of $25 paid. Receipt #0862-9684. This was a duplicate payment made in 2019 and credited to 2020 annual admission fee for Vincent Steven Geis. (ksy)
January 15, 2019 Filing 2 Annual Admission Fee of $25 paid. Receipt #0862-2850959. This was a duplicate payment made in 2019 and credited to 2020 annual admission fee for Desiree A Kilburg. (ksy)
January 3, 2019 Filing 1 Annual Admission Fee of $25 paid. Receipt #0862-2842113. This was a duplicate payment made in 2019 and credited to 2020 annual admission fee for Brandy Ranee Lundy. (ksy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 2020 Annual Attorney Fee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: 2020 Annual Attorney Fee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?