Miller v. Brazant et al
Plaintiff: Tyler Miller
Defendant: J.S.M Marion, LTD dba McDonald's, Danielle Brazant, Katie Papesh and JSM Marion, Ltd
Case Number: 1:2020cv00005
Filed: January 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Judge Kelly KE Mahoney
Referring Judge: Linda R Reade
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2020 Filing 5 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by JSM Marion, Ltd (Wolle, Thomas)
January 24, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Danielle Brazant, JSM Marion, Ltd, Katie Papesh.(Wolle, Thomas)
January 13, 2020 Set Deadline: Defendant JSM Marion, Ltd's LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 1/31/2020. (pac)
January 13, 2020 Filing 3 DOCKET Annotation: Attached is the case packet used in removal cases. (pac)
January 13, 2020 Filing 2 STATE Court Petition and Jury Demand by Tyler Miller. (pac)
January 13, 2020 Judge Linda R Reade and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney added (no conflicts identified). (pac)
January 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Linn County District Court, case number LACV094549. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AIANDC-3105731), filed by Danielle Brazant, J.S.M Marion, LTD dba McDonald's, Katie Papesh. Scheduling Report due by 3/10/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Court filings, #2 Exhibit LR 81 Statement, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Wolle, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Brazant et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Miller
Represented By: Bradley J Kaspar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.S.M Marion, LTD dba McDonald's
Represented By: Thomas D Wolle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danielle Brazant
Represented By: Thomas D Wolle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katie Papesh
Represented By: Thomas D Wolle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JSM Marion, Ltd
Represented By: Thomas D Wolle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?