Davis v. Area Substance Abuse Council, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Nichole Davis
Defendant: Samantha Rogers and Area Substance Abuse Council, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00008
Filed: January 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Referring Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Setting Hearing: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 3/31/2020 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 3/25/2020. (pac)
March 24, 2020 Filing 7 (DOCKETED IN ERROR) STIPULATION proposed scheduling order and discovery plan by Nichole Davis (Stoltze, Bruce) Modified text on 3/24/2020 (mmc).
February 18, 2020 *** Attorney Amanda M Bartusek terminated from case pursuant to #4 Notice to Attorney Not Admitted (eBartusek). (skm)
February 11, 2020 Filing 6 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Area Substance Abuse Council, Inc (Merritt, Megan)
January 27, 2020 Set Deadlines: Defendant Area Substance Abuse Council, Inc. LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 2/17/2020. (mmc)
January 27, 2020 Filing 5 DOCKET Annotation: Please find New Removal Case Packet attached. (mmc)
January 27, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE to Attorney Not Admitted to Practice in the United States District Court for the Northern District of Iowa. (eAtty Bartusek) (mmc)
January 27, 2020 Filing 3 STATE Court Petition with Jury Demand by Nichole Davis. (mmc) Modified text on 1/27/2020 (skm).
January 27, 2020 Judge CJ Williams and Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. Conflicts checked; none found. (mmc)
January 24, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER Jury Demand to Complaint by Area Substance Abuse Council, Inc., Samantha Rogers.(Merritt, Megan)
January 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Iowa District Court for Linn County, case number LACV094474. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AIANDC-3119001), filed by Area Substance Abuse Council, Inc., Samantha Rogers. Scheduling Report due by 3/24/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - State Pleadings, #2 Exhibit Ex B - State Notice, #3 Exhibit Ex C - LR 83.1 Statement, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Merritt, Megan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Area Substance Abuse Council, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samantha Rogers
Represented By: Megan Rett Merritt
Represented By: Mark P Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Area Substance Abuse Council, Inc.
Represented By: Megan Rett Merritt
Represented By: Mark P Hudson
Represented By: Megan R Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nichole Davis
Represented By: Amanda M Bartusek
Represented By: Bruce H Stoltze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?