Blakeman v. Cook et al
Plaintiff: William E Blakeman, III
Defendant: Steven M Cook and Nurse Practitioner
Case Number: 1:2020cv00032
Filed: March 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Referring Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Dismissal Pursuant to Local Rule 41(a)(4). Unless appropriate action is taken by 5/18/2020, this action will be dismissed. Signed by Clerk on 5/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 LR 41) (PSLC) (copy w/NEF and docket sheet mailed to Plt) (skm)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying #1 Pro Se Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis: Plaintiff will be given thirty days from the date of this order to pay the full $400 filing fee. If plaintiff does not pay the filing fee, this case will be dismissed with no further order of the Court. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 3/13/2020. (copy mailed to Pltf) (jjh)
March 9, 2020 Filing 2 PRO SE MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff William E Blakeman, III (NEF mailed to Pltf) (jjh)
March 9, 2020 Filing 1 PRO SE MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff William E Blakeman, III (Attachments: #1 1983 complaint) (NEF mailed to Pltf) (jjh)
March 9, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge CJ Williams and Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts. (conflicts checked, none found) (jjh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blakeman v. Cook et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven M Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Practitioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William E Blakeman, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?