White et al v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Janet Lynn White and Shawn White
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 1:2020cv00043
Filed: March 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Referring Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING Order and Discovery Plan: Initial Disclosures due date of 6/4/2020 but not filed with the court. Fact Discovery due by 2/1/2021. Plaintiffs' Expert Witness due by 2/25/2021. Defendants' Expert Witnesses due by 3/25/2021. Parties' Rebuttal Experts due by 4/19/2021. Motions due by 7/21/2021. Trial Ready Deadline 12/20/2021 (see Order text for additional details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 5/21/2020. (jag)
May 18, 2020 Filing 21 MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts: Scheduling Conference held on 5/18/2020. (Official Court Record: FTR Gold) (ksy)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Setting Hearing: Rule 16(b) and 26(f) Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 5/18/2020 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts. See Order text for conference bridge instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 5/14/2020. (jag)
May 5, 2020 Filing 19 STIPULATION re #18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Eric D. Roslansky Joint Stipulation Re: Filing #18 by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Lederer, Gregory)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Eric D Roslansky on behalf of Plaintiffs Janet Lynn White and Shawn White. Upon a review of the Motion and the Certificate of Good Standing, the court finds the Motion should be granted. Signed by Clerk on 5/5/20. (ksy)
May 4, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Eric D. Roslansky by Plaintiffs Janet Lynn White, Shawn White (Attachments: #1 Appendix Certificate of Good Standing) (Roslansky, Eric)
May 4, 2020 Filing 17 ***TEXT ORDER - granting #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Noah Lindenfeld; and granting #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John S Gearan on behalf of Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. Upon review of the motions and previous admission of these attorneys in related cases, the court finds the motions should be granted. Signed by Clerk on 5/4/20. (ksy) Modified on 5/14/2020 (ksy).
May 1, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John S. Gearan by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Gearan, John)
May 1, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Noah Lindenfeld by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Lindenfeld, Noah)
April 22, 2020 Filing 14 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Becton, Dickinson and Company for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Lederer, Gregory)
April 14, 2020 Set Deadline: The parties are to submit a Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery plan in these matters on or before 5/12/2020. Associated Cases: 6:20-cv-02020-CJW-MAR, 1:20-cv-00043-CJW-MAR, 6:20-cv-02021-CJW-MAR, 6:20-cv-02022-CJW-MAR (Action take pursuant to direction from MAR Chambers) (NEF to non-ECF attorneys) (jag)
April 7, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Allyson Fawcett Aden on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Aden, Allyson)
April 7, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney Richard B North, Jr on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Lederer, Gregory)
April 7, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory M Lederer on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Lederer, Gregory)
March 27, 2020 Filing 10 Documents received from MDL Court AZ 2:15-md-02641-DGC as to Janet Lynn White, Shawn White v Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Attachments: #1 Case Management Orders, #2 Daubert Orders, #3 Deposition Designation Orders, #4 Discovery and Privilege Orders, #5 Discovery Orders, #6 Master and Short-Form Pleadings, #7 Miscellaneous Orders, #8 Motions in Limine Orders, #9 Transfer Order) (des)
March 27, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE to Attorney Eric Roslansky Not Admitted to Practice in the Northern District of Iowa (eAtty Roslansky) (des)
March 27, 2020 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:16-cv-01100. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. NORTHERN DISTRICT OF IOWA DOCKET BEGINS HERE (eAtty Roslansky) Modified on 3/27/2020 (des)
March 27, 2020 Judge CJ Williams and Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. No conflicts identified. (des)
March 25, 2020 Remark: Case transferred to the Northern District of Iowa via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/27/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SECOND AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/20/20. [Amending to Remove Case: Lisa Riley v. C. R. Bard, Inc., 2:18-cv-00896-NV from page 25 of Schedule B] (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/27/2020.]
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD)--See document for details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/6/20. (SJF) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/27/2020.]
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. (Third) See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/4/20. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/4/20. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/27/2020.]
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/27/2020.]
April 19, 2016 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX170837 as to Eric Roslansky. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/27/2020.]
April 18, 2016 Filing 3 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Eric Roslansky on behalf of Janet Lynn White and Shawn White. (LSP) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/27/2020.]
April 18, 2016 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-16-1100-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LSP) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/27/2020.]
April 18, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number PHX170857 filed by Shawn White, Janet Lynn White. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LSP) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/27/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White et al v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Gregory M Lederer
Represented By: John S Gearan, III
Represented By: Allyson Fawcett Aden
Represented By: Noah Lindenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Gregory M Lederer
Represented By: John S Gearan, III
Represented By: Allyson Fawcett Aden
Represented By: Noah Lindenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Lynn White
Represented By: Eric Roslansky
Represented By: Eric D Roslansky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn White
Represented By: Eric Roslansky
Represented By: Eric D Roslansky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?