State Farm Fire and Casualty Company et al v. Air Vents, Inc
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, as Subrogee for Dan and Kim Ranschau, Kim Ranschau, Dan Ranschau and State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Defendant: Air Vents, INC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00060
Filed: June 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Referring Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Air Vents, Inc.(Schultheis, Mark)
July 6, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Driscoll, Kevin)
July 6, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Air Vents, Inc served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020. (Driscoll, Kevin)
June 30, 2020 Filing 3 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Driscoll, Kevin)
June 9, 2020 Set Deadline: Plaintiff LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 6/30/2020 (des)
June 9, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Air Vents, Inc. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 Civil Actions new case packet) (des)
June 9, 2020 Judge CJ Williams and Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. No conflicts identified. (des)
June 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Air Vents, INC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AIANDC-3216885.), filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, as Subrogee for Dan and Kim Ranschau, Kim Ranschau, Dan Ranschau. Scheduling Report due by 9/8/2020 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Driscoll, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company et al v. Air Vents, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, as Subrogee for Dan and Kim Ranschau
Represented By: Kevin J Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Ranschau
Represented By: Kevin J Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Ranschau
Represented By: Kevin J Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Kevin J Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air Vents, INC
Represented By: Mark Allen Schultheis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?