Gooden v. Iowa, State of
Defendant: Iowa, State of
Petitioner: Clifford Arnell Gooden, III and Clifford A Gooden, III
Case Number: 1:2020cv00065
Filed: June 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Referring Judge: Leonard T Strand
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2020 Filing 9 COURTESY Notice from the 8th Circuit Court of Appeals #4 Notice of Appeal (jjh)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER of USCA as to #4 Pro Se Notice of Appeal filed by Clifford A Gooden, III: The Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER. (no documents to forward) (jjh)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER of USCA as to #4 Pro Se Notice of Appeal filed by Clifford A Gooden, III: The $505 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to either pay the fee in the district court or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in the district court within 21 days of the date of this order. If appellant does not pay the fee or move for IFP status by August 24 2020, an order will be entered directing the appellant to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. (jjh)
August 4, 2020 Filing 6 USCA Case Number 20-2613 for #4 Pro Se Notice of Appeal filed by Clifford A Gooden, III. (jjh)
August 3, 2020 Filing 5 NOA Supplement and Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #4 Pro Se Notice of Appeal. Case Number due by 8/6/2020. (copy mailed to Petitioner)(jjh)
July 30, 2020 Filing 3 CLERK'S Judgment in favor of State of Iowa against Clifford A Gooden, III. Signed by the Clerk on 7/30/2020. (kms) (NEF and Judgment mailed to petitioner)
July 29, 2020 Filing 4 PRO SE NOTICE of Appeal as to #2 Order and #3 Judgment by Clifford A Gooden, III (NEF mailed to Def per PSLC) (jjh)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 INITIAL Review Order Denying Petition and Dismissing Case. Signed by Chief Judge Leonard T Strand on 7/28/2020. (NEF and Order mailed to Petitioner) (kms)
June 22, 2020 Filing 1 PRO SE PETITION for Writ of Mandamus, filed by Clifford Arnell Gooden, III. Dismissal Deadline 10/5/2020 (ksy)(NEF to Pet)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gooden v. Iowa, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Clifford Arnell Gooden, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Clifford A Gooden, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iowa, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?