Hassan v. Fort Dodge Correctional Facility
Petitioner: Dhuuh Mohamed Hassan
Respondent: Robert Johnson
Case Number: 1:2020cv00083
Filed: August 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Referring Judge: Leonard T Strand
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Filing 9 MAIL Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Dhuuh Mohamed Hassan which included NEF for #8 Pro Se Correspondence. Remailed to Hardin County Jail. (des)
September 21, 2020 Filing 8 Correspondence by Dhuuh Mohamed Hassan (NEF, reply and docket sheet mailed to Petitioner per PSLC) (jjh)
September 21, 2020 Filing 7 PRO SE MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Petitioner Dhuuh Mohamed Hassan. (Filed pursuant to PSLC)(Nef and docket sheet mailed to petitioner). (ac)
September 11, 2020 Filing 6 PRO SE NOTICE of Change of Address by Dhuuh Mohamed Hassan. (filed per PSLC)(NEF mailed to defendant at new address) (kms)
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 FEE Receipt: $5, receipt number IAN550002327 - Writ of Habeas Corpus filing fee by Dhuuh Mohamed Hassan (jag)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Hassan will be given thirty days from the date of this order to either pay the filing fee or file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis which complies with the rules set out above. If Hassan does not pay the filing fee or file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis, this case will be dismissed with no further order from the court. Signed by Chief Judge Leonard T Strand on 8/14/2020. (Order, NEF and IFP form mailed to petitioner) (kms)
August 14, 2020 Filing 3 Case transferred in from District of Iowa Southern; Case Number 4:20-cv-00254. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Modified text on 8/14/2020 (PSLC notified) (skm). NORTHERN DISTRICT OF IOWA DOCKET BEGINS HERE
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Signed by Chief Judge John A. Jarvey on 8/12/2020. (mem) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 8/14/2020.]
August 11, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Dhuuh Mohamed Hassan. (don) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 8/14/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hassan v. Fort Dodge Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dhuuh Mohamed Hassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?