Retail, Wholesale and Department Store Union v. Quaker Manufacturing
Plaintiff: Local 110, Retail, Wholesale and Department Store Union, UFCW, AFL-CIO and Local 110 Retail, Wholesale and Department Store Union
Defendant: Quaker Manufacturing, LLC, dba Quaker Oats Company and Quaker Manufacturing, LLC doing business as Quaker Oats Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv00101
Filed: October 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Judge Kelly KE Mahoney
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 27 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2020 Filing 15 BRIEF in Support re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed by Quaker Manufacturing, LLC. (Best, Susan)
December 2, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) by Defendant Quaker Manufacturing, LLC Responses due by 12/16/2020 (Best, Susan)
November 19, 2020 Filing 13 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Complaint, #2 Notice MJ Case Assignment, #3 Summons Issued on Defendant Acknowledgement filed by Local 110 Retail, Wholesale and Department Store Union. (Day, Joseph)
November 17, 2020 Filing 12 TEXT ORDER re #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Susan J. Best and #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Thomas Bradley on behalf of Defendant. Upon review of the motions and certificates of good standing, the court finds the motions should be granted. CM/ECF Registration for Best and Bradley due by 12/1/2020. Signed by Clerk on 11/17/2020. (eBest, eBradley) (jjh)
November 16, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Thomas Bradley ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number AIANDC-3327032) by Defendant Quaker Manufacturing, LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing of Thomas Bradley) (Wolle, Thomas)
November 16, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Susan J. Best ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number AIANDC-3327021) by Defendant Quaker Manufacturing, LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing of Susan Best) (Wolle, Thomas)
November 13, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED Complaint against Quaker Manufacturing, LLC, filed by Local 110 Retail, Wholesale and Department Store Union. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Agreement (Collective Bargaining Agreement), #2 Exhibit Award and Opinion) (Day, Joseph)
November 11, 2020 Filing 8 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Quaker Manufacturing, LLC (Wolle, Thomas)
November 9, 2020 Filing 7 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Local 110 Retail, Wholesale and Department Store Union (Day, Joseph)
November 6, 2020 Filing 6 ** TEXT ORDER ONLY ** GRANTING #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Quaker Manufacturing, LLC; Answer deadline ordered extended for Quaker Manufacturing, LLC, to 12/2/2020. Signed by United States Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 11/06/2020. (Gollhofer, Jami)
November 5, 2020 Filing 5 UNRESISTED Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by Defendant Quaker Manufacturing, LLC (Wolle, Thomas)
November 4, 2020 Set Deadline: Defendant LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 11/25/2020. (jjh)
November 2, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Local 110 Retail, Wholesale and Department Store Union. Quaker Manufacturing, LLC served on 10/26/2020, answer due 11/16/2020. (Day, Joseph)
October 22, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Quaker Manufacturing, LLC. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Case Packet) (jjh)
October 22, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk Status Deadline 11/23/2020. (jjh)
October 22, 2020 Set Deadline: Plaintiff LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 11/12/2020. (jjh)
October 22, 2020 Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney added. (conflicts checked, none found) (jjh)
October 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Quaker Manufacturing, LLC, dba Quaker Oats Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AIANDC-3311461.), filed by Local 110, Retail, Wholesale and Department Store Union, UFCW, AFL-CIO. Scheduling Report due by 1/19/2021 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2) (Day, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Retail, Wholesale and Department Store Union v. Quaker Manufacturing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local 110, Retail, Wholesale and Department Store Union, UFCW, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Joseph E Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local 110 Retail, Wholesale and Department Store Union
Represented By: Joseph E Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quaker Manufacturing, LLC, dba Quaker Oats Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quaker Manufacturing, LLC doing business as Quaker Oats Company
Represented By: Thomas D Wolle
Represented By: Thomas Stephen Bradley
Represented By: Susan Best
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?