Davis v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Eugene Davis
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2020cv00117
Filed: December 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Referring Judge: Leonard T Strand
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2021 Filing 10 PRO SE Response to #9 Resistance to #3 Pro Se Motion for Expedited Relief filed by Eugene Davis. (NEF mailed to Pltf per PSLC) (jjh)
January 21, 2021 Filing 9 Response to Motion re #3 EXPEDITED Relief Requested (and Gov't Response to Court's Order at Docket #2) filed by United States of America. (Reinert, Patrick)
January 13, 2021 Filing 8 PRO SE SUPPLEMENT to #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Eugene Davis (NEF mailed to Pltf per PSLC) (jjh)
December 31, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED PRO SE MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Eugene Davis. (PSLC)(NEF mailed to Filer) (mmc)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL Review Order: Plaintiff submit certified copy of inmate account statement. Davis will be given an additional 30 days to file an amended motion to proceed in forma pauperis that complies with the rules set out in my prior order. The Clerk's office is directed to send Davis a copy of the standard in forma pauperis form. The Clerk's office is directed to send a copy of this order to both the Linn County Correctional Center and the Linn County Attorney. Signed by Chief Judge Leonard T Strand on 12/23/2020. (NEF and Order mailed to plaintiff; Order mailed to Linn Co. Correctional Center and Linn Co. Attorney) (kms)
December 22, 2020 Filing 5 PRO SE SUPPLEMENT to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (PSLC)(NEF mailed to Def) (mmc)
December 22, 2020 Filing 4 PRO SE MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Eugene Davis. (PSLC)(NEF mailed to Def) (mmc)
December 16, 2020 Filing 3 PRO SE MOTION for EXPEDITED Relief Requested by Plaintiff Eugene Davis. (filed as such pursuant to PSLC)(NEF mailed to filer) (kms)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: Petitioner Eugene Davis shall submit filing fee or motion to proceed in forma pauperis by 1/14/2021 or this case will be dismissed with no further order from the court. Government is given 45 days to respond whether claim is properly brought at 2241 or should be 2255 and is currently barred by 2255(h). Petitioner will then be given 30 days to reply to the Government's response. Signed by Chief Judge Leonard T Strand on 12/11/2020. (copy w/nef and IFP form mailed to petitioner) (des) Modified text on 12/15/2020 (skm).
December 7, 2020 Filing 1 PRO SE PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Eugene Davis. Dismissal Deadline 3/22/2021. (NEF mailed to Pltf per PSLC) (jjh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?