Sulzner v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Justin Paul Sulzner
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2021cv00027
Filed: March 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Referring Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2021 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #10 Notice by Commissioner of Social Security (Schunk, Jacob) Modified text to add link on 4/28/2021 (skm).
April 27, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob A Schunk on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security. (Schunk, Jacob)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #8 PRO SE Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 4/22/21. (ksy)(Copy w/NEF to Plf)
April 19, 2021 Filing 8 PRO SE MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Justin Paul Sulzner (PSLC) (NEF mailed to Plt). (skm)
April 12, 2021 Filing 7 PRO SE NOTICE by Justin Paul Sulzner (PSLC) (NEF mailed to Plt). (skm)
March 29, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 New Social Security Case Packet) (NEF and case packet mailed to plaintiff)(Summons, Complaint, Order in this case eUSA) (kms) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/30/2021: #2 Certificate of Service from USA) (kms).
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis: The clerk is ordered to file the complaint and issue a summons. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 3/29/2021. (kms) Modified to correct text on 3/29/2021 (kms). (NEF and order mailed to plaintiff)
March 26, 2021 Filing 3 AMENDED PRO SE MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis re #2 Order by Plaintiff Justin Paul Sulzner. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (NEF mailed to Plaintiff) (sgw)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER denying #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff will be given 30 days to either pay the full filing fee, or file an amended motion to proceed in forma pauperis that is attached to a proposed complaint or appeal. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 3/18/2021. (sgw) (NEF w/Copy mailed to Plaintiff)
March 18, 2021 Set Deadlines re #2 Order: Amended Pleadings or Payment of Filing Fee due by 4/17/2021. (sgw)
March 11, 2021 Filing 1 PRO SE MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Justin Paul Sulzner (NEF mailed to Pltf per PSLC) (jjh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sulzner v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Paul Sulzner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Jacob A Schunk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?