Botsford v. Penn Center, Inc
Plaintiff: Theresa Botsford
Defendant: Penn Center, Inc
Case Number: 1:2021cv00036
Filed: March 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Judge Kelly KE Mahoney
Referring Judge: Linda R Reade
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2021 Filing 5 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Penn Center, Inc (Stefani, Ryan)
April 5, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Penn Center, Inc.(Stefani, Ryan)
March 30, 2021 Filing 3 DOCKET Annotation: Please find Civil Removal Actions new case packet attached (des)
March 30, 2021 Filing 2 STATE Court Petition and Jury Demand by Theresa Botsford (des)
March 30, 2021 Judge Linda R Reade and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney added. No conflicts identified. (des)
March 30, 2021 Set Deadline: Defendant LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 4/20/2021 (des)
March 29, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Linn County District Court, case number LACV097213. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AIANDC-3418078), filed by Penn Center, Inc. Scheduling Report due by 5/28/2021 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Local Rule 81(a) Statement, #3 Exhibit A - State Court Petition and Jury Demand, #4 Exhibit B - State Court Original Notice, #5 Exhibit C - State Court summons, #6 Exhibit D - State court Affidavit of Service) (Stefani, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Botsford v. Penn Center, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Botsford
Represented By: Thomas D Wolle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penn Center, Inc
Represented By: Ryan Stefani
Represented By: Frank Harty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?