Hill v. Trimble et al
Plaintiff: Nicholas W Hill and Nicholas Wesley Hill
Defendant: Nathan Trimble and Ace
Case Number: 1:2021cv00066
Filed: July 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Referring Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2021 Filing 4 MAIL Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Nicholas W Hill which included #1 Complaint. No fwding address. (ksy)
July 22, 2021 Filing 3 MAIL Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Nicholas W Hill which included #2 Order. Mail resent to updated address on Vine website (Henry County Jail). (sgw)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: Plaintiff will be given thirty days from the date of this order to either pay the complete $402 filing fee or file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis which complies with the rules. If plaintiff fails to either pay the filing fee or file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis within 30 days, this case will be dismissed with no further order of the Court. The Clerk of Court is directed to send plaintiff the standard motion to proceed in forma pauperis form. Plaintiff is directed to file an amended complaint clarifying the events giving rise to his complain occurred. The Clerk of Court is directed to send plaintiff the standard 42 U.S.C. 1983 form. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 7/14/2021. (Order/NEF/IFP Form/1983 form mailed to Pltf) (mmc)
July 9, 2021 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT With Jury Demand against Ace, Nathan Trimble, filed by Nicholas W Hill. Dismissal Deadline 10/20/2021. (ksy)(NEF to Plf)(PSLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. Trimble et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas W Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Wesley Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Trimble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?