ArenaCo v. JLG Architects
Plaintiff: ArenaCo
Defendant: JLG Architects
Case Number: 1:2021cv00073
Filed: August 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Referring Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2021 Filing 4 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by ArenaCo (Abernathy, Terry)
August 30, 2021 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ArenaCo. JLG Architects waiver sent on 8/24/2021, answer due 10/25/2021. (Abernathy, Terry)
August 20, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to JLG Architects. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Civil Case Packet) (ksy)
August 20, 2021 Set Deadline: Plaintiff LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 9/9/2021. (ksy)
August 20, 2021 Judge CJ Williams and Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. No conflicts identified. (ksy)
August 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JLG Architects ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AIANDC-3514723.), filed by ArenaCo. Scheduling Report due by 11/17/2021 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1: Design Services Agreement (DSA), #3 Exhibit 2: Assignment of Architect Design Services Agreement) (Abernathy, Terry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ArenaCo v. JLG Architects
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ArenaCo
Represented By: Bradley J Kaspar
Represented By: Matthew G Novak
Represented By: Terry J Abernathy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JLG Architects
Represented By: Eric Gregory Hoch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?