De La Rosa et al v. Gardner Global Logistics et al
Plaintiff: Elvia De La Rosa, Sergio De La Rosa, Armando De La Rosa, Cruz De La Rosa and Kenia De La Rosa
Defendant: Garner Global Logistics and Gardner Trucking Inc
Case Number: 1:2021cv00076
Filed: September 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Office: Cedar Rapids Office
Presiding Judge: Judge Kelly KE Mahoney
Referring Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE to Attorneys Mike H Bassett, Lana Patrice Beverly, S Clark Harmonson, Kirk L Pittard, Stephen Wayne Stewart, Ryan P Teel and William Richard Thompson Not Admitted to Practice in the United States District Court For the Northern District of Iowa. Admissions due by 9/15/2021. (eAttys) (des)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Case transferred in from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 3:21-cv-00341. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. NORTHERN DISTRICT OF IOWA DOCKET BEGINS HERE Modified on 9/1/2021 (des).
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Memorandum Opinion and Order - The Court finds that this case could have brought in the Northern District of Iowa and, for the convenience of the parties and witnesses, in the interest of justice, the Court in its discretion transfers this case to the Northern District of Iowa pursuant to 1404(a). (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 9/1/2021) (chmb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/1/2021.]
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Judge CJ Williams and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney added. No conflicts identified. (des)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary filed by ADR Provider. Attorneys in Attendance: Doug Dunham and Stephen Stewart. Prv Fee: $ 1,400.00. Outcome of ADR: Parties were unable to reach a settlement. (Carnahan, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/1/2021.]
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Joint Mediation Report filed by Gardner Trucking Inc, Garner Global Logistics. (Bassett, Mike) Modified text on 7/30/2021 (mjr). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/1/2021.]
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER - Before the Court is the parties'Joint Amended Motion to Disclose Confidential Settlement Agreement (Doc. No. 13). The Court GRANTS the motion. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 7/12/2021) (chmb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/1/2021.]
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #12 Motion to Disclosure Confidential Settlement Agreement filed by Armando De La Rosa, Cruz De La Rosa, Elvia De La Rosa, Kenia De La Rosa, Sergio De La Rosa (Pittard, Kirk) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/1/2021.]
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Motion to Disclosure Confidential Settlement Agreement filed by Armando De La Rosa, Cruz De La Rosa, Elvia De La Rosa, Kenia De La Rosa, Sergio De La Rosa (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion)Attorney William Richard Thompson added to party Armando De La Rosa(pty:pla), Attorney William Richard Thompson added to party Cruz De La Rosa(pty:pla), Attorney William Richard Thompson added to party Elvia De La Rosa(pty:pla), Attorney William Richard Thompson added to party Kenia De La Rosa(pty:pla), Attorney William Richard Thompson added to party Sergio De La Rosa(pty:pla) (Thompson, William) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/1/2021.]
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court will defer transferring this case sua sponte until after the parties file their mediation report with the Court as ordered. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 6/2/2021) (chmb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/1/2021.]
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Designation of Mediator by Gardner Trucking Inc, Garner Global Logistics. (Bassett, Mike) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/1/2021.]
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court hereby orders the parties to complete mediation no later than July 27, 2021, and to file a Mediation Report describing the status of settlement negotiations no later than August 3, 2021. The parties' obligation to file a Mediation Report is separate from any reporting requirements of the mediator. Furthermore, within 7 days from the date of this Order, the parties shall submit a Joint Designation of Mediator in which the parties either name an agreed mediator or state that they cannot agree upon a mediator. If the parties do not notify the Court of an agreed-upon mediator by this deadline, the Court will appoint one. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 5/25/2021) (chmb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/1/2021.]
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Gardner Trucking Inc, Garner Global Logistics re #7 TRIAL BRIEF (Bassett, Mike) Modified docket text on 5/17/2021 (oyh). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/1/2021.]
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TRIAL BRIEF Regarding Transfer of This Case to Another Federal Court Pursuant to 28 USC 1404(a) by Armando De La Rosa, Cruz De La Rosa, Elvia De La Rosa, Kenia De La Rosa, Sergio De La Rosa. (Pittard, Kirk) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/1/2021.]
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Defendants Gardner Global Logistics, Inc. and Gardner Trucking, Inc. removed the case to this Court on February 18, 2021. Plaintiffs originally filed suit in the 44th Judicial District Court of Dallas County, Texas on January 8, 2021; therefore, removal to this Court was proper. See 28 U.S.C. 1441(a) (case filed in state court may be removed by defendant to the federal district court "for the district and division embracing the place where such action is pending."); see also Burlington N. & Santa Fe Ry. Co. v. Herzog Servs., Inc., 990 F.Supp. 503, 504 (N.D. Tex. 1998)(McBryde, J.). Based on this record, the Court will evaluate whether a transfer of this case is warranted to either the District of Arizona or the Northern District of Iowa. See 28 U.S.C. 82 & 95. However, before transferring this case sua sponte, the Court will give the parties an opportunity to be heard on this matter. The parties may file a brief on whether this case is appropriate for transfer under 1404(a) and, if so, to which district or division where it might have been brought. The parties' respective briefs must be filed within 30 days of the date of this Order and are not to exceed 25 pages in length. There will be no responsive briefs permitted unless otherwise ordered by the Court. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 4/15/2021) (chmb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/1/2021.]
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kirk L Pittard on behalf of Armando De La Rosa, Cruz De La Rosa, Elvia De La Rosa, Kenia De La Rosa, Sergio De La Rosa. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Pittard, Kirk) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/1/2021.]
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Local Rule 83.10(a) requires the appearance of local counsel where counsel of record for a party does not reside in this district. Accordingly, within twenty days of this date, plaintiff Elvia De La Rosa, shall file the entry of appearance of local counsel satisfying the requirements of Local Rule 83.10(a). Failure to do so may result in dismissal of this case without prejudice and without further notice. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 3/15/2021) (chmb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/1/2021.]
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mjr) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/1/2021.]
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Gardner Trucking, Inc., Garner Global Logistics. (Bassett, Mike) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/1/2021.]
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Garner Global Logistics, Gardner Trucking, Inc.. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-11614605) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Cover Sheet Supplement, #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s), #7 Exhibit(s)) (Bassett, Mike) (Attachment 1 replaced/flattened on 2/18/2021) (mjr). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 9/1/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: De La Rosa et al v. Gardner Global Logistics et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elvia De La Rosa
Represented By: Stephen Wayne Stewart
Represented By: Kirk L Pittard
Represented By: Lana Patrice Beverly
Represented By: Ryan P Teel
Represented By: S Clark Harmonson
Represented By: William Richard Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sergio De La Rosa
Represented By: Stephen Wayne Stewart
Represented By: Kirk L Pittard
Represented By: Lana Patrice Beverly
Represented By: Ryan P Teel
Represented By: S Clark Harmonson
Represented By: William Richard Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Armando De La Rosa
Represented By: Stephen Wayne Stewart
Represented By: Kirk L Pittard
Represented By: Lana Patrice Beverly
Represented By: Ryan P Teel
Represented By: S Clark Harmonson
Represented By: William Richard Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cruz De La Rosa
Represented By: Stephen Wayne Stewart
Represented By: Kirk L Pittard
Represented By: Lana Patrice Beverly
Represented By: Ryan P Teel
Represented By: S Clark Harmonson
Represented By: William Richard Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenia De La Rosa
Represented By: Stephen Wayne Stewart
Represented By: Kirk L Pittard
Represented By: Lana Patrice Beverly
Represented By: Ryan P Teel
Represented By: S Clark Harmonson
Represented By: William Richard Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garner Global Logistics
Represented By: Mike H Bassett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gardner Trucking Inc
Represented By: Mike H Bassett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?