Van Meter Inc v. Innovative Solar Inc
Plaintiff: Van Meter Inc
Defendant: Innovative Solar Inc
Case Number: 1:2021cv00078
Filed: September 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2021 Filing 9 CLERK'S Default Entry granting #8 Motion for Default Entry against Defendant Innovative Solar Inc. Signed by Clerk on 10/21/2021. (Copy with NEF mailed to Defaulted Party) (mmc)
October 20, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Default Entry against Defendant Innovative Solar Inc. by Plaintiff Van Meter Inc (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Attorney Merritt in Support of Application for Entry of Default) (Merritt, Megan) Modified text on 10/21/2021 (mmc).
September 30, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Van Meter Inc. Innovative Solar Inc served on 9/27/2021, answer due 10/18/2021. (Merritt, Megan)
September 28, 2021 Filing 6 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Van Meter Inc (Merritt, Megan)
September 27, 2021 Filing 5 *TEXT ORDER ONLY* ORDER Granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Plaintiff's Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement. Plaintiff has until October 1, 2021 to file its LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement. Signed by United States Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 09/27/2021. (Steele, Amy)
September 24, 2021 Filing 4 UNRESISTED Motion for Extension of Time to File 7.1 Statement by Plaintiff Van Meter Inc (Merritt, Megan)
September 8, 2021 Set Deadline: Plaintiff LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 9/24/2021. (mmc)
September 7, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Innovative Solar Inc. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Civil Case Packet) (mmc)
September 7, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 10/7/2021. (mmc)
September 7, 2021 Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. Conflicts checked; none found. (mmc)
September 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Innovative Solar Inc ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AIANDC-3524633.), filed by Van Meter Inc. Scheduling Report due by 12/2/2021 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Ex 1 - Master Supply Agreement, #3 Exhibit Ex 2 - Paid Invoices, #4 Exhibit Ex 3 - Unpaid Invoices, #5 Exhibit Ex 4 - Ledger) (Merritt, Megan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Van Meter Inc v. Innovative Solar Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Van Meter Inc
Represented By: Megan R Merritt
Represented By: Megan Rett Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Innovative Solar Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?