Smith v. Marion Police Department et al
Plaintiff: William Jesse Smith
Defendant: Marion Police Department and Lance Miller
Case Number: 1:2022cv00027
Filed: March 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Referring Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER of USCA as to #9 Pro Se Notice of Appeal filed by William Jesse Smith: If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER. (no documents to forward) (jjh)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER of USCA as to #9 Pro Se Notice of Appeal filed by William Jesse Smith: The $505 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to either pay the fee in the district court or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in the district court within 21 days of the date of this order. (jjh)
May 5, 2022 Filing 11 USCA Case Number 22-1938 for #9 Pro Se Notice of Appeal filed by William Jesse Smith. (jjh)
May 3, 2022 Filing 10 NOA Supplement and Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #9 Pro Se Notice of Appeal. Case Number due by 5/6/2022 (copy mailed to Plt). (skm)
May 3, 2022 Filing 9 PRO SE NOTICE of Appeal as to #7 Order and #8 Judgment by William Jesse Smith (NEF mailed to Plt). (skm)
April 19, 2022 Filing 8 JUDGMENT in favor of Marion Police Department, Lance Miller against William Jesse Smith. Signed by Clerk on 4/19/2022. (copy mailed to Pltf) (jjh)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting Defendants' #4 Motion to Dismiss and Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment in favor of defendants and against plaintiff. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 4/19/2022. (copy mailed to Pltf) (jjh)
April 14, 2022 Filing 6 PRO SE Correspondence by William Jesse Smith. (PSLC) (NEF mailed to Plaintiff) (jlh)
April 11, 2022 Filing 5 PRO SE Response to #4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by William Jesse Smith. (PSLC) (NEF mailed to Plaintiff) (jlh)
March 24, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendants Marion Police Department, Lance Miller Responses due by 4/7/2022 (Attachments: #1 Brief) (Schrock, David)
March 15, 2022 Filing 3 DOCKET Annotation re #1 Notice of Removal: Please find attached the Civil Removal Actions Case Packet (copy w/NEF mailed to Plt). (skm)
March 15, 2022 Filing 2 PRO SE STATE Court Petition by William Jesse Smith (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1A) (NEF mailed to Plt). (skm)
March 15, 2022 Judge CJ Williams and Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added (no conflicts found). (skm)
March 14, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Iowa District Court for Linn County, case number LACV096830. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AIANDC-3642410), filed by Lance Miller, Marion Police Department. Dismissal deadline 6/27/22. (Attachments: #1 Index) (Schrock, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/15/2022: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (skm). Modified on 3/16/2022 to correct deadline from scheduling report to dismissal (skm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Marion Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Jesse Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marion Police Department
Represented By: David E Schrock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lance Miller
Represented By: David E Schrock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?