Parents Defending Education v. Linn-Mar Community School District et al
Plaintiff: Parents Defending Education
Defendant: Linn-Mar Community School District, Shannon Bisgard, Brittania Morey, Clark Weaver, Barry L Buchholz, Sondra Nelson, Matt Rollinger, Melissa Walker and Rachel Wall
Amicus Curiae: Amici Professors of Psychology and Human Development, One Iowa and Iowa Safe Schools
Case Number: 1:2022cv00078
Filed: August 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Referring Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 CORRESPONDENCE from the 8th Circuit Court of Appeals re #42 Amended Notice of Appeal. (skm)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order SUPPLEMENTAL Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals. Appeals court case number 22-2927. Notification to print: #42 Amended Notice of Appeal. (skm)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 AMENDED NOTICE of Appeal as to #28 Order denying Motion for Preliminary Injunction and #38 Memorandum Opinion and Order re Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Parents Defending Education. (Connolly, J) Modified text and links on 9/30/2022 (skm).
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order **TEXT ORDER** granting #41 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Lisa Nowlin-Sohl on behalf Iowa Safe Schools and One Iowa. Upon review of the Motion and the Certificate of Good Standing, the court finds the Motion should be granted. Signed by Clerk on 09/26/2022. (klh)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Lisa Nowlin-Sohl ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number AIANDC-3760508) by Amicus Parties Iowa Safe Schools, One Iowa (Bettis Austen, Rita)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #37 Motion to Stay Responsive Pleading and Scheduling Order Deadlines. This case is stayed (See Order text). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 0921/2022. (klh)
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 SUPPLEMENTAL Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals - Notice of Appeal filed 9/12/2022 at #29 . Appeals court case number: 22-2927. Notification to print: #38 Memorandum Opinion and Order (jag)
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Parents Defending Education. The Court writes to provide a more detailed reasoning of its decision finding against plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 9/20/2022. (jag)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 JOINT MOTION to Stay Responsive Pleading and Scheduling Order Deadlines by Plaintiff Parents Defending Education (Connolly, J)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 CLERK'S Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #29 Notice of Appeal. (skm)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript of Motion for Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 9/6/2022, before Judge C.J. Williams. Court Reporter Shelly Semmler, Telephone number 712-233-3846, Email Address ssemmlerreporting@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased from the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter, the Clerk of Court's office, or PACER. Please see Public Administrative Order No. 08-AO-0009-P in regard to relevant policy and access information on the court's website at www.iand.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 10/4/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/14/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/12/2022. (skm)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 USCA Case Number 22-2927 for #29 Notice of Appeal filed by Parents Defending Education. Transcript due by 10/24/2022. (Attachments: #1 USCA Briefing Schedule)(skm)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 BRIEF in Opposition to #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Amici Iowa Safe Schools and One Iowa. (ksy)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 BRIEF in Opposition to #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Amici Professors of Psychology and Human Development. (ksy)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Leave to File as Amici Curiae in Support of Defendants; and granting #25 Motion for Leave to File Amici Curiae in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The Clerks Office is directed to detach and file the Brief of Amicus Curiae Professors of Psychology & Human Development in Support of Defendants attached at Doc. 23-1, and the Brief of Amici Curiae One Iowa and Iowa Safe Schools in Support of Defendants Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction attached at Doc. 25-1. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 9/13/2022. (ksy)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOA Supplement and Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #29 Notice of Appeal. Case Number due by 9/16/2022. (skm)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE of Appeal as to #28 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Parents Defending Education. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number AIANDC-3751970. (Connolly, J)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER denying #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 9/12/22. (ksy)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 TEXT ORDER granting #24 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Asaf Orr on behalf of Amici Professors of Psychology and Human Development. Upon review of the motion and certificate of good standing, the Court finds the motion should be granted. Signed by Clerk on 9/7/2022. (mmc)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Judge C.J. Williams: Motion Hearing held on 9/6/2022 re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Parents Defending Education, #23 MOTION Leave to file Amicus Brief filed by Amici Professors of Psychology and Human Development, #25 UNRESISTED MOTION for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief in Support of Defendants filed by One Iowa, Iowa Safe Schools.The Court takes under advisement the plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction #3 and motions #23 and #25 for leave to file amici briefs. Orders to follow. Official Court Record: Shelly Semmler SSemmlerReporting@gmail.com. (JPS)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 UNRESISTED MOTION for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief in Support of Defendants by Amicus Parties One Iowa, Iowa Safe Schools (Attachments: #1 Brief Proposed Amicus Brief - Unopposed) (Bettis Austen, Rita)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Asaf Orr (Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number - AIANDC-3747429) by Amicus Amici Professors of Psychology and Human Development (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Orr, Asaf) Modified to add receipt number on 9/7/2022 (mmc).
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION Leave to file Amicus Brief by Amicus Amici Professors of Psychology and Human Development (Attachments: #1 Brief) (Schultes, Laura)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura May Schultes on behalf of Amici Professors of Psychology and Human Development. (Schultes, Laura)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 REPLY BRIEF in Support re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Parents Defending Education. (skm)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Leave to File Overlength Brief. The Clerk of Court is directed to detach and file plaintiff's Reply in Support of its #3 Motion for a Preliminary Injunction attached at Doc. 19-1. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 9/2/2022. (skm)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 UNRESISTED MOTION for Leave to File Overlength Brief by Plaintiff Parents Defending Education (Attachments: #1 Reply In Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction) (Connolly, J)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Parents Defending Education. All Defendants. (Hasson, James)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RESISTANCE to Motion re #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendants Shannon Bisgard, Barry L Buchholz, Linn-Mar Community School District, Brittania Morey, Sondra Nelson, Matt Rollinger, Melissa Walker, Rachel Wall, Clark Weaver. (mmc)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave to File Overlength Brief. The Clerk of Court is directed to detach and file defendants' Resistance to Plaintiff's #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction attached at Doc. #15 -1. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 8/26/2022. (mmc)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 UNRESISTED MOTION for Leave to File Overlength Brief by Defendants Shannon Bisgard, Barry L Buchholz, Linn-Mar Community School District, Brittania Morey, Sondra Nelson, Matt Rollinger, Melissa Walker, Rachel Wall, Clark Weaver (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit) (Van Heukelem, Miriam)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines as to #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Response/Resistance due by 8/25/2022. (kms)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 *TEXT ORDER* granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Resistance to Plaintiffs' #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The deadline for defendants to file a resistance is extended to 8/25/2022. Signed by Judge C.J. Williams on 8/22/2022. (skv) Modified to add link on 8/23/2022 (mmc).
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 UNRESISTED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Resistance to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Defendants Shannon Bisgard, Barry L Buchholz, Linn-Mar Community School District, Brittania Morey, Sondra Nelson, Matt Rollinger, Melissa Walker, Rachel Wall, Clark Weaver (Van Heukelem, Miriam)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by James F Hasson on behalf of Parents Defending Education. (Hasson, James)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by John Michael Connolly on behalf of Parents Defending Education. (Connolly, John)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order DOCKET Annotation re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction: Hard copy received in clerks's office. (ksy)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Parents Defending Education (Ostergren, Alan)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #7 and #8 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorneys J Michael Connolly and James F Hasson on behalf of Plaintiff Parents Defending Education. Upon a review of the Motion and the Certificates of Good Standing, the court finds the Motions should be granted on the condition the attorneys register for NextGen by by 9/1/2022. Signed by Clerk on 8/18/2022. (eAttys Connolly and Hasson) (mmc)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney James F. Hasson ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number AIANDC-3736386) by Plaintiff Parents Defending Education (Attachments: #1 certificate of good standing) (Ostergren, Alan)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney J. Michael Connolly ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number AIANDC-3736371) by Plaintiff Parents Defending Education (Attachments: #1 certificate of good standing) (Ostergren, Alan)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Setting Hearing on #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction: Motion Hearing set for 9/6/2022 10:00 AM in Ctrm 3 (4th Floor) Cedar Rapids before Judge CJ Williams (see text of Order). Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 8/16/2022. (skm)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Miriam Deborah Van Heukelem on behalf of All Defendants. (Van Heukelem, Miriam)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Ann Kolbe on behalf of All Defendants. (Kolbe, Emily)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Deadline: Plaintiff LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 8/23/2022. (mmc) Modified to correct deadline date on 8/10/2022 (mmc).
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Expedited Relief Requested by Plaintiff Parents Defending Education (Attachments: #1 Brief in support of motion for preliminary injunction, #2 Declaration of Parent A, #3 Declaration of Parent B, #4 Declaration of Parent C, #5 Declaration of Parent D, #6 Declaration of Parent E, #7 Declaration of Parent F, #8 Declaration of Parent G, #9 Declaration of Nicole Neilly, #10 Declaration of James Hasson - Vol 1, #11 Declaration of James Hasson - Vol 2) (Ostergren, Alan) Modified text on 8/8/2022 (mmc).
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Civil Case Packet) (mmc)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Judge CJ Williams and Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. Conflicts checked; none found. (mmc)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AIANDC-3726691.), filed by Parents Defending Education. Scheduling Report due by 10/31/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit School district policy, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Ostergren, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parents Defending Education v. Linn-Mar Community School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parents Defending Education
Represented By: Alan Ostergren
Represented By: J Michael Connolly
Represented By: James F Hasson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linn-Mar Community School District
Represented By: Emily Ann Kolbe
Represented By: Miriam Deborah Van Heukelem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Bisgard
Represented By: Emily Ann Kolbe
Represented By: Miriam Deborah Van Heukelem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brittania Morey
Represented By: Emily Ann Kolbe
Represented By: Miriam Deborah Van Heukelem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark Weaver
Represented By: Emily Ann Kolbe
Represented By: Miriam Deborah Van Heukelem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry L Buchholz
Represented By: Emily Ann Kolbe
Represented By: Miriam Deborah Van Heukelem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sondra Nelson
Represented By: Emily Ann Kolbe
Represented By: Miriam Deborah Van Heukelem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Rollinger
Represented By: Emily Ann Kolbe
Represented By: Miriam Deborah Van Heukelem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Walker
Represented By: Emily Ann Kolbe
Represented By: Miriam Deborah Van Heukelem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachel Wall
Represented By: Emily Ann Kolbe
Represented By: Miriam Deborah Van Heukelem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Amici Professors of Psychology and Human Development
Represented By: Asaf Orr
Represented By: Laura May Schultes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: One Iowa
Represented By: Lisa Nowlin-Sohl
Represented By: Rita Bettis Austen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Iowa Safe Schools
Represented By: Lisa Nowlin-Sohl
Represented By: Rita Bettis Austen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?