Copenhaver v. Tripp
Petitioner: Randy Mitchell Copenhaver
Respondent: Chris Tripp
Case Number: 1:2022cv00135
Filed: November 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Judge Kelly KE Mahoney
Referring Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL Review Order: The Clerk of Court is directed to send a copy of the petition, along with a copy of this order, to the respondent in care of the Iowa Attorney General's Office. Respondent is to file the relevant state court record within thirty days of the date of this order. Respondent must file his answer, along with any responsive briefing, within sixty (60) days of the date of this Order. Petitioner will be given thirty (30) days from the date of the respondent's pleading to file a response. #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel is denied. #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is denied as moot. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 12/30/2022. (Petition & Order mailed to respondent) (Copy of Order mailed to Petitioner) (JLH)
December 13, 2022 FEE Receipt: $ 5.00, receipt number 1250 for Habeas Filing Fee by Randy Mitchell Copenhaver (ksy)
December 12, 2022 Filing 7 PRO SE MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Randy Mitchell Copenhaver. (ksy)(NEF to Pet) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/13/2022: #1 Envelope) (ksy).
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #1 Pro Se Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Petitioner Randy Mitchell Copenhaver. Petitioner pay $5.00 filing fee within thirty days or this case will be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 11/17/2022. (copy mailed to petitioner) (des)
November 10, 2022 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Iowa Southern; Case Number 4:22-cv-00377. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Modified on 11/10/2022 (des). NORTHERN DISTRICT OF IOWA DOCKET BEGINS HERE (copy of docket sheet mailed to petitioner; PSLC notified)
November 10, 2022 Judge CJ Williams and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney added. No conflicts identified. (des)
November 10, 2022 ***Civil Case Terminated. Case electronically transferred to IAND. (kjw) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 11/10/2022.]
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. This case is transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Iowa. See order for particulars. Signed by Senior Judge James E. Gritzner on 11/9/2022. (NMK) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 11/10/2022.]
November 7, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Randy M. Copenhaver. Responses due by 11/21/2022. (btg) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 11/10/2022.]
November 7, 2022 Filing 2 CERTIFICATION OF INMATE ACCOUNT AND ASSETS by Randy M. Copenhaver (btg) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 11/10/2022.]
November 7, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Randy M. Copenhaver. (btg) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 11/10/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Copenhaver v. Tripp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Randy Mitchell Copenhaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chris Tripp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?