Eden v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Shawn M Eden and Shawn Eden
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Ssaogcomms
Case Number: 1:2023cv00017
Filed: March 13, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Judge Kelly KE Mahoney
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1383 Review of HHS Decision
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by James D Sides on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security. (Sides, James)
March 14, 2023 Filing 5 DOCKET Annotation re #4 Social Security Complaint: Please find attached the Social Security Case Packet. (skm)
March 14, 2023 Filing 4 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Shawn Eden. Dismissal Deadline 6/26/2023. (skm)
March 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis: The Clerk of Court is ordered to file the complaint and docket the notice of social security case service. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 3/14/2023. (skm)
March 14, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check status by 4/13/2023. (skm)
March 14, 2023 Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney added (no conflicts found). (skm)
March 14, 2023 Pursuant to Rule 3 of the Supplemental Rules of Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. 405(g), the Clerk has issued a Notice of Electronic Case Filing (NEF) using the Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system, notifying the appropriate Regional Social Security Administration's Office of General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office of the case. No summons shall issue. Commissioner of Social Security served on 3/14/2023, answer due 5/15/2023. (skm)
March 13, 2023 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Shawn M Eden (Attachments: #1 Complaint - Social Security, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kappelman, Wes)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eden v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn M Eden
Represented By: Wes Kappelman
Represented By: Corbett Allen Luedeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Eden
Represented By: Corbett Allen Luedeman
Represented By: Wes Kappelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: James D Sides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Ssaogcomms
Represented By: Ssaogcomms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?