Livingston v. Risk
Plaintiff: Irina Livingston
Defendant: Winthrop Spiridon Risk II and Winthrop Risk
Case Number: 1:2024cv00017
Filed: February 6, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Judge Kelly KE Mahoney
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 08 U.S.C. ยง 1151 Immigration and Nationality Act of 1952
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2024 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Winthrop Risk.(Meyer, Elizabeth)
February 20, 2024 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Irina Livingston. Winthrop Risk served on 2/14/2024, answer due 3/15/2024. (Cole, Maria) Modified text on 2/20/2024 (kms).
February 13, 2024 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Apexa Patel: Upon review of the motion and certificate of good standing, the Court finds the motion should be granted. Attorney Apexa Patel is authorized to appear on behalf of Plaintiff Irina Livingston. Signed by Clerk on 2/13/2024. (No conflicts identified) (pac) Modified text on 2/14/2024 (pac).
February 7, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE by Irina Livingston re #1 Complaint, Civil Coversheet (Cole, Maria)
February 7, 2024 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Winthrop Risk ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 Civil Case Packet) (pac)
February 7, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 5/7/2024. (pac)
February 7, 2024 Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney added (no conflicts identified). (pac)
February 6, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Apexa Patel ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number AIANDC-4094210) by Plaintiff Irina Livingston (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Patel, Apexa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/13/2024: #2 Updated Certificate of Good Standing) (pac).
February 6, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Irina Livingston against Winthrop Spiridon Risk II ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AIANDC-4093894.), filed by Irina Livingston. Scheduling Report due by 5/6/2024 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Support) (Cole, Maria)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Livingston v. Risk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irina Livingston
Represented By: Apexa Patel
Represented By: Maria Victoria Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winthrop Spiridon Risk II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winthrop Risk
Represented By: Elizabeth R Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?