Ludovissy v. Deere & Company et al
Plaintiff: Regina M. Ludovissy
Defendant: Deere & Company and John Deere Dubuque Works
Case Number: 2:2009cv01023
Filed: June 11, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Office: Eastern Dubuque Office
County: Dubuque
Presiding Judge:
Presiding Judge: Edward J McManus
Presiding Judge: Jon S Scoles
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER adopting 18 Report and Recommendations; granting 16 Motion for Sanctions; and granting 17 Second Motion for Sanctions. Defendant's are awarded $2,759.00 in attorney's fees and expenses from Plaintiff. This matter is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge Edward J McManus on 3/18/10. (ksy) (copy w/NEF to Plf)
February 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending the district court grant 16 MOTION for Sanctions against Regina Ludovissy filed by Deere & Company, John Deere Dubuque Works, and 17 MOTION for Sanctions against Plaintiff filed by Deere & Company, John Deer e Dubuque Works. Motions no longer referred to Magistrate Judge 16 MOTION for Sanctions against Regina Ludovissy, 17 MOTION for Sanctions against Plaintiff. Objections to R&R due by 3/9/2010. It is recommended that the motions for sanctions be granted, the case be dismissed with prejudice, and that Defendants be awarded $2,759.00 in attorney's fees and expenses. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jon S Scoles on 2/23/10. (Stigler, Karo) Modified on 2/23/2010 - copy w/nef to pro se party (de).
July 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying without prejudice 5 Motion for Telephonic Scheduling Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jon S Scoles on 7/1/09. (Stigler, Karo) Modified text on 7/1/2009 to add copy w/NEF to Pro Se plt (skm).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ludovissy v. Deere & Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deere & Company
Represented By: Debra Lynne Hulett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Deere Dubuque Works
Represented By: Debra Lynne Hulett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina M. Ludovissy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?