Bourquin v Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc
Plaintiff: Sara E Bourquin
Defendant: Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc
Case Number: 2:2018cv01032
Filed: August 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Office: Eastern Dubuque Office
County: Dubuque
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Referring Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2018 Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts: Magistrate Judge CJ Williams no longer assigned to the case: No conflicts identified (kfs)
August 30, 2018 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc.(Wong, Lauren)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John M. Russell and #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Lauren A. Wong on behalf of Defendant Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge CJ Williams on 08/22/2018. (No conflicts identified) (jjh)
August 22, 2018 Filing 9 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc (Kaspar, Bradley)
August 20, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Lauren A. Wong ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 75 receipt number 0862-2756161) by Defendant Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Wong, Lauren)
August 20, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John M. Russell ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 75 receipt number 0862-2756155) by Defendant Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Russell, John)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #3 State Court Petition; Answer deadline extended for Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc. is extended to August 30, 2018. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge CJ Williams on 8/9/18. (ksy)
August 9, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc (Hinz, Stephanie)
August 3, 2018 Set Deadline: Defendant's LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 08/24/2018 (kfs)
August 3, 2018 Filing 4 DOCKET Annotation: Please find new removal case packet attached (kfs)
August 3, 2018 Filing 3 STATE Court Petition with Jury Demand filed by Plaintiff Sara E Bourquin (kfs)
August 3, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge: Check Status ddl 09/03/2018 (kfs)
August 3, 2018 Chief Magistrate Judge CJ Williams added: No conflicts identified as to judge, parties and attorneys (kfs)
August 2, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Iowa District Court for Dubuque County: Case Number LACV107796 (Filing Fee $400: Receipt Number 0862-2746296) filed by Defendant Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc: Scheduling Report ddl 10/01/2018 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet #2 LR 81 (a) Removal List) (Kaspar, Bradley) Modified text on 08/03/2018 (kfs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bourquin v Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara E Bourquin
Represented By: Emilie J Roth Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc
Represented By: Bradley J Kaspar
Represented By: Stephanie L Hinz
Represented By: Lauren A Wong
Represented By: John M Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?