Rupp v. Trzil et al
Plaintiff: Noah J Rupp
Defendant: Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company, School Sisters of Saint Francis, Inc, Rose Ann Trzil and School Sisters of Saint Francis of Saint Joseph's Convent, Milwaukee, Wisconsin, Inc, The
Case Number: 2:2018cv01033
Filed: August 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Office: Eastern Dubuque Office
County: Dubuque
Presiding Judge: Kelly Mahoney
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2018 Filing 18 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by School Sisters of Saint Francis, Inc, The School Sisters of Saint Francis of Saint Joseph's Convent Milwaukee, Wisconsin, Inc, Rose Ann Trzil (Wright, E)
September 12, 2018 Filing 17 ANSWER With Jury Demand to #11 Amended Complaint, by School Sisters of Saint Francis, Inc, The School Sisters of Saint Francis of Saint Joseph's Convent Milwaukee, Wisconsin, Inc, Rose Ann Trzil.(Wright, E)
September 12, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by E David Wright on behalf of School Sisters of Saint Francis, Inc, The School Sisters of Saint Francis of Saint Joseph's Convent Milwaukee, Wisconsin, Inc, Rose Ann Trzil. (Wright, E)
September 12, 2018 Set Deadline: Defendant School Sisters of Saint Francis, Inc LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 9/15/2018. (ksy)
September 12, 2018 Set Deadline: Defendant The School Sisters of Saint Francis of Saint Joseph's Convent Milwaukee, Wisconsin, Inc LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 10/6/2018. (ksy)
September 11, 2018 Filing 15 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Reddick, Les)
September 10, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Noah J Rupp. The School Sisters of Saint Francis of Saint Joseph's Convent Milwaukee, Wisconsin, Inc served on 9/6/2018, answer due 9/27/2018. (Spannagel, Brian)
September 6, 2018 ***Attorney Todd L Stevenson for Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company added pursuant to #13 . Conflicts reviewed, none found. Attorney admission verified. (ksy)
September 5, 2018 Filing 13 ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint, by Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company.(Reddick, Les)
September 5, 2018 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to The School Sisters of Saint Francis of Saint Joseph's Convent Milwaukee, Wisconsin, Inc. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Civil Case Packet) (ksy)
September 5, 2018 Filing 11 FIRST AMENDED Complaint With Jury Demand against Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company, School Sisters of Saint Francis, Inc, Rose Ann Trzil, The School Sisters of Saint Francis of Saint Joseph's Convent Milwaukee, Wisconsin, Inc, filed by Noah J Rupp. (ksy)
September 4, 2018 Filing 10 ** TEXT ORDER ONLY ** granting #9 Motion to Amend/Correct petition. For the reasons stated in the motion (Doc. 9), and because the motion is not objected to, the Clerk of Court shall detach and docket the amended petition (Doc. 9-1) pursuant to Local Rule 15. Signed by United States Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 09/04/2018. (Gollhofer, Jami)
August 29, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint and Jury Demand - Uncontested by Plaintiff Noah J Rupp Check Status on MJ Consent due by 9/12/2018. (Attachments: #1 First Amended Complaint and Jury Demand) (Spannagel, Brian)
August 24, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER With Jury Demand to Complaint by School Sisters of Saint Francis, Inc, Rose Ann Trzil.(Wright, E)
August 24, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by E David Wright on behalf of School Sisters of Saint Francis, Inc, Rose Ann Trzil. (Wright, E)
August 23, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Noah J Rupp. Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company served on 8/21/2018, answer due 9/11/2018. (Spannagel, Brian)
August 22, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Noah J Rupp. School Sisters of Saint Francis, Inc served on 8/15/2018, answer due 9/5/2018. (Spannagel, Brian)
August 22, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Noah J Rupp. Rose Ann Trzil served on 8/16/2018, answer due 9/6/2018. (Spannagel, Brian)
August 14, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Defendants Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company, School Sisters of Saint Francis, Inc and Rose Ann Trzil****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION****(Attachment #1 New Civil Case Packet) (kfs)
August 14, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge: Check Status ddl 09/13/2018 (kfs)
August 14, 2018 Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney added: No conflicts identified as to judge, parties and attorneys (kfs)
August 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT With Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2753233.), filed by Noah J Rupp. Scheduling Report due by 11/13/2018 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Spannagel, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rupp v. Trzil et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Todd L Stevenson
Represented By: Les V Reddick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: School Sisters of Saint Francis, Inc
Represented By: E David Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rose Ann Trzil
Represented By: E David Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: School Sisters of Saint Francis of Saint Joseph's Convent, Milwaukee, Wisconsin, Inc, The
Represented By: E David Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noah J Rupp
Represented By: Mark E Liabo
Represented By: Brian D.W. Spannagel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?