Wood et al v. Paccar Inc et al

Plaintiff: Jacqueline Wood and Michael Gerald Wood
Defendant: Unknown Fabricators and Manufactures, Paccar, Inc and Peterbilt Motors Company
Claimant: JMJ Equipment Transport, Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv01010
Filed: April 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Linda R Reade
Referring Judge: Mark A Roberts
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 TRIAL Management Order: Witness and exhibit lists exchanged by parties (but not filed) at least 21 days before FPTC. Exhibits marked. Jury Instructions 3 days before FPTC. Motions in limine 21 days before FPTC. Pretrial Conference set for 10/19/2020 8:30 AM in Ctrm 1 (2nd Floor) Cedar Rapids before Judge Linda R Reade. Jury Trial set for 10/19/2020 9:00 AM in Ctrm 1 (2nd Floor) Cedar Rapids before Judge Linda R Reade. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/10/2020 4:00 PM in Ctrm 1 (2nd Floor) Cedar Rapids before Judge Linda R Reade. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/7/2020. Signed by Judge Linda R Reade on 7/3/19. (ksy) Modified text on 7/7/2019 (des)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SCHEDULING Order and Discovery Plan: Initial Disclosures due date of 6/18/19 but not filed with the court. Add Parties Deadline due by 8/5/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 8/12/2019. Plaintiffs Expert Witness due by 12/16/2019. Defendants Expert Witnesses due by 2/17/2020. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Experts due by 3/17/2020. Discovery due by 4/20/2020. Motions due by 5/18/2020. Trial Ready Deadline 10/19/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 7/2/19. (ksy)
July 3, 2019 Filing 25 MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts: Scheduling Conference held on 7/3/2019. (Official Court Record: FTR Gold) (ksy)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Setting Hearing: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 7/2/2019 at 3:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 6/26/2019. (pac)
June 21, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE by Paccar, Inc of Parties' Joint Request for Scheduling Conference (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Pearson, Chris)
June 18, 2019 Filing 22 (FILED IN ERROR) NOTICE by Paccar, Inc, Peterbilt Motors Company of Service of Initial Disclosures (Pearson, Chris) Modified on 6/19/2019 to note pursuant to LR 26(f)(1) this document should not have been filed (des)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE Order granting #20 Joint Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 6/13/2019. (mmc)
June 12, 2019 Filing 20 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Defendant Paccar, Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Pearson, Chris)
May 23, 2019 Filing 19 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Michael Gerald Wood (Crowley, Steven)
May 7, 2019 Filing 18 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Paccar, Inc (Pearson, Chris) Modified text on 5/8/2019 (des)
May 6, 2019 Filing 17 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Lee Brown on behalf of Plaintiffs Michael Gerald Wood and Jacqueline Wood. Upon a review of the Motion and the Certificate of Good Standing, the court finds the Motion should be granted on the condition attorney submits CM/ECF Registration Form by 5/20/2019. Signed by Clerk on 5/6/2019. (eAtty Brown) (des)
May 3, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Lee Brown ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2933269) by Plaintiff Michael Gerald Wood (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Crowley, Steven)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying without prejudice #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Lee Brown. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 5/3/2019. (pac)
May 1, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Lee Brown by Plaintiff Michael Gerald Wood (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Crowley, Steven)
April 30, 2019 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Maria S Korzendorfer and #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac vice for Attorney Richard Grafton on behalf of Defendant Paccar Inc. Upon a review of the Motions and the Certificates of Good Standing, the court finds the Motions should be granted. Signed by Clerk on 4/30/2019. (des)
April 29, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Richard Grafton (Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2929535) by Defendant Paccar, Inc (Attachments: #1 Texas Supreme Court Certifiecation) (Read, Thomas) Modified name of attachment on 4/30/2019 (des)
April 29, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Maria S Korzendorfer (Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2929524) by Defendant Paccar, Inc (Attachments: #1 Texas Bar Certification) (Read, Thomas) Modified name of attachment on 4/30/2019 (des)
April 29, 2019 Filing 11 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Chris Pearson on behalf of Defendant Paccar Inc. Upon a review of the Motion and the Certificate of Good Standing, the court finds the Motion should be granted. Signed by Clerk on 4/29/2019. (des)
April 26, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Chris Pearson (Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2928320) by Defendant Paccar, Inc (Attachments: #1 Texas Bar Certification) (Read, Thomas) Modified text on 4/29/2019 (des)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying without prejudice #5 Motion for Protective Order (see text of Order). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 4/25/2019. (skm)
April 24, 2019 Set Deadline: Defendants Paccar Inc and Peterbilt Motor Company LR 7.1 Disclosure Statements due by 5/15/2019 (des)
April 24, 2019 Filing 8 DOCKET Annotation: Civil Removal Actions new case packet attached (des)
April 24, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Lien by Patrick V Waldron on behalf of JMJ Equipment Transport, Inc (des)
April 24, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE and Partial Resistance to #5 Motion for Protective Order filed by Jacqueline Wood, Michael Gerald Wood (des)
April 24, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Protective Order by Defendants Paccar, Inc, Peterbilt Motors Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Stipulated Protective Order) (des)
April 24, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to First Amended Complaint by Paccar, Inc, Peterbilt Motors Company (des)
April 24, 2019 Filing 3 STATE Court Petition by Jacqueline Wood, Michael Gerald Wood (Attachments: #1 First Amended Petition at Law and Request for Jury Trial, #2 Dismissal With Prejudice Geico Insurance Company, #3 Dismissal Without Prejudice City of Dubuque, #4 Dismissal With Prejudice David McGhee) (des)
April 23, 2019 Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Paccar, Inc, Peterbilt Motors Company (Read, Thomas)
April 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Iowa District Court, Dubuque County, case number LACV108041. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2925583), filed by Paccar, Inc. Scheduling Report due by 6/24/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A First Amended Petition, #2 Exhibit B Answer Paccar Inc and Peterbilt Motors Company, #3 Exhibit C Dismissal of City of Dubuque Without Prejudice, #4 Exhibit D Dismissal of David McGhee With Prejudice, #5 Exhibit E Dismissal of Geico Insurance Company, #6 Exhibit F List of Pending Motions, #7 Exhibit G List of Counsel, #8 Exhibit H Notice of Filing in State Court, #9 Exhibit I Petition, #10 Exhibit J Return of Service Paccar Financial Corp, #11 Exhibit K Return of Service Geico Insurance Agency Inc, #12 Exhibit L Return of Service City of Dubuque, #13 Exhibit M Answer City of Dubuque, #14 Exhibit N Answer Geico Insurance Company, #15 Exhibit O Jury Demand Geico Insurance Company, #16 Exhibit P Notice of Lien, #17 Exhibit Q Notice Setting Trial Scheduling Conference, #18 Exhibit R Resetting Trial Scheduling Conference, #19 Exhibit S Chris A Pearson Pro Hac Vice Application, #20 Exhibit T Order granting Chris A Pearson Pro Hac Vice, #21 Exhibit U Trial Setting Order, #22 Exhibit V Order for Judge Assignment, #23 Exhibit W Motion For Summary Judgment, #24 Exhibit X Brief, #25 Exhibit Y Statement of Undisputed Facts, #26 Exhibit Z Motion for Extension of Time to Resist Summary Judgment Motion, #27 Exhibit AA Order for Extension of Time to Resist Summary Judgment Motion, #28 Exhibit BB Phillip Brown Pro Hac Vice Application, #29 Exhibit CC Order granting Phillip Brown Pro Hac Vice, #30 Exhibit DD Motion for Protective Order, #31 Exhibit EE Stipulated Protective Order, #32 Exhibit FF Motion to Compel Discovery Responses, #33 Exhibit GG Resistance to Motion to Compel, #34 Exhibit HH Order Setting Motion to Compel Hearing, #35 Exhibit II Withdrawal of Motion to Compel, #36 Exhibit JJ Motion for Extension of Time to Resist Protective Order Motion, #37 Exhibit KK Order for Extension of Time to Resist Protective Order Motion, #38 Exhibit LL Order for Extension of Time to Resist Protective Order Motion, #39 Exhibit MM Response to Protective Order Motion) (Read, Thomas) Modified names of attachments on 4/23/2019 (des)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wood et al v. Paccar Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Fabricators and Manufactures
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paccar, Inc
Represented By: Thomas B Read
Represented By: Maria Shanti Korzendorfer
Represented By: Chris Pearson
Represented By: Richard Harley Grafton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peterbilt Motors Company
Represented By: Thomas B Read
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Wood
Represented By: Steven J Crowley
Represented By: Edward John Prill
Represented By: Lee Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Gerald Wood
Represented By: Steven J Crowley
Represented By: Edward John Prill
Represented By: Lee Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: JMJ Equipment Transport, Inc
Represented By: Patrick V Waldron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?