Design Basics, LLC et al v. Spahn & Rose Lumber Co
Plaintiff: Carmichael & Dame Design, Inc and Design Basics, LLC
Defendant: Spahn & Rose Lumber Co
Case Number: 2:2019cv01015
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Referring Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 9 *TEXT ORDER ONLY* granting #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael T Hopkins and #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Scott M Francis: Upon review of the motions and certificate of good standing, the court finds these motions should be granted. It is so ordered that Attorneys Michael T Hopkins and Scott M Francis are authorized to appear on behalf of Plaintiffs Design Basics, LLC and Carmichael & Dame Design, Inc. Signed by Clerk on 7/10/2019. (pac)
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Scott M. Francis by Plaintiffs Carmichael & Dame Design, Inc, Design Basics, LLC (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing) (Gainer, Robert)
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael T. Hopkins by Plaintiffs Carmichael & Dame Design, Inc, Design Basics, LLC (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing) (Gainer, Robert)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 *TEXT ORDER ONLY* granting #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Dana A LeJune. Upon review of the motion and certificate of good standing, the court finds the motion should be granted. It is so ordered that Attorney Dana A LeJune is authorized to appear on behalf of Plaintiffs Design Basics, LLC and Carmichael & Dame Designs, Inc. Signed by Clerk on 6/25/2019. (pac)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Dana A. LeJune by Plaintiffs Carmichael & Dame Design, Inc, Design Basics, LLC (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing) (Gainer, Robert)
June 24, 2019 Reset Deadline due to calculation error: Plaintiff's LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 7/11/2019. (pac)
June 21, 2019 (DOCKETED IN ERROR) Set Deadline: Defendant LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 6/12/2019 (des) Modified on 6/25/2019 (jjh).
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 DOCKET Annotation: AO 121 and #1 Complaint mailed to Register of Copyrights (des)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Spahn & Rose Lumber Co. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 Civil Actions new case packet) (des)
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Carmichael & Dame Design, Inc, Design Basics, LLC (Gainer, Robert)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT With Jury Demand against Spahn & Rose Lumber Co. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0862-2965119), filed by Carmichael & Dame Design, Inc, Design Basics, LLC. Scheduling Report due by 9/18/2019 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15) (Gainer, Robert) Modified text on 6/21/2019 (pac).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Design Basics, LLC et al v. Spahn & Rose Lumber Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spahn & Rose Lumber Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmichael & Dame Design, Inc
Represented By: Robert Cardell Gainer
Represented By: Michael T Hopkins
Represented By: Scott M Francis
Represented By: Dana Andrew LeJune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Design Basics, LLC
Represented By: Robert Cardell Gainer
Represented By: Michael T Hopkins
Represented By: Scott M Francis
Represented By: Dana Andrew LeJune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?