United States of America v. Bolsinger et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Citibank, N.A., Jeffrey S Bolsinger, Darcy L. Bolsinger, Dell Financial Services, LLC, Citibank, NA and Darcy L Bolsinger
Case Number: 2:2020cv01003
Filed: January 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Kelly KE Mahoney
Referring Judge: Judge Kelly KE Mahoney
2 Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2020 Set Deadline: Defendant Dell Financial Services, LLC's LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 3/11/2020. (ksy)
February 27, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Dell Financial Services, LLC served on 2/11/2020, answer due 3/3/2020. (Schunk, Jacob)
February 27, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Citibank, NA waiver sent on 1/31/2020, answer due 3/31/2020. (Schunk, Jacob)
February 27, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Jeffrey S Bolsinger waiver sent on 2/11/2020, answer due 4/13/2020. (Schunk, Jacob)
February 27, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Darcy L Bolsinger waiver sent on 2/11/2020, answer due 4/13/2020. (Schunk, Jacob)
February 3, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Darcy L. Bolsinger, Jeffrey S Bolsinger, Citibank, N.A., Dell Financial Services, LLC. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Case Packet) (ksy)
January 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. Dismissal Deadline 5/13/2020 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F) (Schunk, Jacob)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Bolsinger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey S Bolsinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darcy L. Bolsinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dell Financial Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank, NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darcy L Bolsinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Jacob A Schunk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?