Menge v. Simon's Trucking Inc
Plaintiff: Kevin Menge
Defendant: Simon's Trucking Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv01016
Filed: May 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2617
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TRIAL Management Order: Witness and exhibit lists exchanged by parties (but not filed) at least 21 days before FPTC. Exhibits marked. Jury Instructions 3 days before FPTC. Motions in limine 21 days before FPTC. Pretrial Conference set for 10/18/2021 08:30 AM in Ctrm 2 (2nd Floor) Cedar Rapids before Chief Judge Leonard T Strand. Jury Trial set for 10/18/2021 09:00 AM in Ctrm 2 (2nd Floor) Cedar Rapids before Chief Judge Leonard T Strand. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/5/2021 03:00 PM in Telephonic Hearing before Chief Judge Leonard T Strand. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/1/2021. [see ORDER for details] Signed by Chief Judge Leonard T Strand on 6/30/2020. (kms)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING Order and Discovery Plan: Initial Disclosures due date of 7/2/2020 but not filed with the court. Add Parties Deadline due by 8/21/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 8/21/2020. Plaintiffs Expert Witnesses due by 9/21/2020. Defendants Expert Witnesses due by 11/20/2020. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Experts due by 12/22/2020. Discovery due by 2/22/2021. Motions due by 3/19/2021. Trial Ready Deadline 8/16/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 6/29/2020. (skm)
June 29, 2020 Filing 10 MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 6/26/2020. Order to follow (Official Court Record: FTR Gold). (skm)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Setting Hearing re #8 Proposed Scheduling Order: A telephonic Rule 16(b) and 26(f) scheduling conference is set for 6/26/2020 11:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts (see text of Order for instructions). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 6/23/2020. (skm)
June 22, 2020 Filing 8 PROPOSED Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan by Plaintiff Kevin Menge (Wilson, Emily)
June 17, 2020 Filing 7 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Simon's Trucking Inc (Haas, Frances)
June 2, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Ethan S Olson on behalf of Simon's Trucking Inc. (Olson, Ethan)
June 2, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint Defendant's Answer and Affirmative Defenses by Simon's Trucking Inc.(Haas, Frances)
June 2, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Frances M Haas on behalf of Simon's Trucking Inc. (Haas, Frances)
May 19, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kevin Menge. Simon's Trucking Inc served on 5/14/2020, answer due 6/4/2020. (Wilson, Emily)
May 6, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Simon's Trucking Inc. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 Civil Actions new case packet) (des)
May 6, 2020 Chief Judge Leonard T Strand and Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. No conflicts identified. (des)
May 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT With Jury Demand against Simon's Trucking Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AIANDC-3192389.), filed by Kevin Menge. Scheduling Report due by 8/3/2020 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Wilson, Emily)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Menge v. Simon's Trucking Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simon's Trucking Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Menge
Represented By: Emily Elaine Wilson
Represented By: Melissa Carol Hasso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?