Lumpkins v. Muenster et al
Plaintiff: Blanch Lumpkins, Sr
Defendant: Michael Muenster, Dubuque County Jail, Mary Unknown, Dr. Lisa A Tyler and Dr Lisa A Tyler
Case Number: 2:2020cv01035
Filed: August 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Judge Kelly KE Mahoney
Referring Judge: Leonard T Strand
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2020 Filing 10 PRO SE MOTION for Discovery by Plaintiff Blanch Lumpkins, Sr. (Filed pursuant to PSLC)(nef mailed to plaintiff). (ac)
October 15, 2020 Filing 9 PRO SE Correspondence by Plaintiff Blanch Lumpkins, Sr (filed as such pursuant to PSLC) (nef mailed to plaintiff) (des)
October 13, 2020 Filing 8 PRO SE Correspondence by Blanch Lumpkins, Sr w/response. (ksy)(Copy w/NEF to Plf)(PSLC)
October 7, 2020 Filing 7 PRO SE Correspondence by Blanch Lumpkins, Sr. (Filed as such pursuant to PSLC)(NEF and Copy of Docket Sheet sent to filer) (kms)
September 16, 2020 Filing 6 PRO SE AMENDED MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Blanch Lumpkins, Sr (ksy)(NEF to Plf)(PSLC)
September 14, 2020 Filing 4 (DUPLICATE ENTRY) PRO SE MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Blanch Lumpkins, Sr. (NEF mailed to plaintiff) (pac) Modified text on 9/14/2020 (pac).
September 11, 2020 Filing 5 PRO SE MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Blanch Lumpkins, Sr. (LTS Chambers) (NEF to Plaintiff) (jag)
September 11, 2020 Filing 3 PRO SE AMENDED MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Blanch Lumpkins, Sr. (Filed pursuant to PSLC)(Nef mailed to plaintiff). (ac)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 INITIAL Review Order: Plaintiff to submit certified copy of inmate account statement and amended motion to proceed in forma pauperis. If plaintiff does not file an amended motion within thirty days, this case will be dismissed with no further order of the court. Signed by Chief Judge Leonard T Strand on 8/31/2020. (NEF, Order, IFP form) (kms)
August 27, 2020 Filing 1 PRO SE MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Blanch Lumpkins, Sr (Attachments: #1 1983 Petition) (ksy)(NEF to Plf)(PSLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lumpkins v. Muenster et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blanch Lumpkins, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Muenster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dubuque County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Lisa A Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Lisa A Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?