Myles v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Michael E Myles
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2021cv01019
Filed: September 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Judge Kelly KE Mahoney
Referring Judge: Leonard T Strand
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #8 Pro Se Motion to Reconsider #5 Order. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 10/19/2021. (copy mailed to Pltf) (jjh)
October 14, 2021 Filing 8 PRO SE MOTION to Reconsider #5 Order denying Motion to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Michael E Myles (NEF mailed to Pltf per PSLC) (jjh)
October 5, 2021 Filing 7 PRO SE SEALED Brief re #1 Complaint by Michael E Myles. (NEF mailed to Pltf per PSLC) (jjh)
September 29, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Social Security Case Packet) (ksy)(copy w/NEF to Plf)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying #4 Motion to Appoint Counsel. The Clerk of Court shall issue summons. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 9/29/21. (ksy)(copy w/NEF to Plf)
September 23, 2021 Filing 4 PRO SE MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Michael E Myles (PSLC) (NEF mailed to Plt). (skm)
September 23, 2021 Filing 3 PRO SE MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Michael E Myles (PSLC) (NEF mailed to Plt). (skm)
September 20, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Kenneth Gillespie on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security. (Gillespie, Matthew)
September 9, 2021 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Michael E Myles. Dismissal Deadline 12/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Complaint) (PSLC) (NEF w/IFP form mailed to Plt) (skm)
September 9, 2021 Chief Judge Leonard T Strand and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney added (no conflicts found). (skm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Myles v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael E Myles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Matthew Kenneth Gillespie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?