Fry v Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Melissa Fry
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Ssaogcomms
Case Number: 2:2022cv01026
Filed: December 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Judge Kelly KE Mahoney
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 416 Denial of Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 UNRESISTED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Certified Administrative Record and extending the deadline for answering Plaintiff's Complaint by filing the Certified Administrative Record is hereby extended to 04/12/2023. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 02/06/2023. (klh)
February 6, 2023 Filing 9 UNRESISTED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Certified Administrative Record by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Carrington, Melissa)
January 25, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by James D Sides on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security. (Sides, James)
December 21, 2022 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kira Treyvus on behalf of Plaintiff Melissa Fry. Upon a review of the Motion and the Certificate of Good Standing, the court finds the Motion should be granted. Signed by Clerk on 12/21/2022. (des)
December 21, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney KIRA TREYVUS ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number AIANDC-3821595) by Plaintiff Melissa Fry (Treyvus, Kira)
December 12, 2022 Filing 5 DOCKET Annotation re #4 Social Security Complaint: Please find attached the new Social Security case packet. (skm)
December 12, 2022 Filing 4 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Melissa Fry. Dismissal Deadline 3/25/2023. (skm)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court is ordered to file the complaint and docket the notice of of social security case service. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 12/12/2022. (skm)
December 12, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 1/12/2023. (des)
December 12, 2022 Pursuant to Rule 3 of the Supplemental Rules of Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. 405(g), the Clerk has issued a Notice of Electronic Case Filing (NEF) using the Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system, notifying the appropriate Regional Social Security Administration's Office of General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office of the case. No summons shall issue. Commissioner of Social Security served on 12/12/2022, answer due 2/10/2023. (skm)
December 12, 2022 Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney added. No conflicts identified. (des)
December 9, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Melissa Fry (Attachments: #1 civil cover sheet, #2 Complaint) (Carter, Ruth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fry v Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Fry
Represented By: Ruth M Carter
Represented By: Kira Treyvus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Ssaogcomms
Represented By: Ssaogcomms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: James D Sides
Represented By: Melissa Ammann Carrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?