Butt v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Charles Butt
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2018cv03054
Filed: August 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Presiding Judge: Mark A Roberts
Referring Judge: Leonard T Strand
2 Judge: CJ Williams
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2018 Case reassigned to Judge CJ Williams: Chief Judge Leonard T Strand no longer assigned to the case: No conflicts identified (kfs)
September 17, 2018 Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. Magistrate Judge CJ Williams-M no longer assigned to case. Conflicts checked; none found. (mml)
August 24, 2018 Case Reassigned to Chief Judge Leonard T Strand and Chief Magistrate Judge CJ Williams. Conflicts checked; none found. (skm)
August 24, 2018 Filing 3 (FILED IN ERROR) NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline by 9/23/2018. (skm) Modified on 8/24/2018, case reassigned to LTS as presiding Judge, disregard this Notice (skm).
August 24, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Civil Case Packet) (skm)
August 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT With Jury Demand against Monsanto Company (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2760248), filed by Charles Butt. Scheduling Report due by 11/23/2018 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Galligan, Brian) (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/24/2018 to add case number to document. Case originally opened in the incorrect division under 18cv87) (skm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Butt v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Butt
Represented By: Brian P Galligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?